Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318198

EP1318198 - Process for producing a recombinant polypeptide involving the addition of an inhibitor of chymotrypsins to the cell culture medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.2007
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 07.11.2007  [2007/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOVITRUM AB
112 76 Stockholm / SE
[2003/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Adamson, Lars
Roburvägen 18 A
181 33 Lidingö / SE
02 / Walum, Erik
Lavettvägen 21
184 60 Akersberga / SE
03 / Dixelius, Johan
Rimbogatan 9
753 24 Uppsala / SE
04 / Lima Lie, Kristina
Grenljusbacken 26
117 65 Stockholm / SE
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Höglund, Lars
Biovitrum AB
Patent Department
112 76 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Höglund, Lars
Biovitrum AB, Patent Department
112 76 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date03000391.713.05.1997
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateSE1996000185514.05.1996         Original published format: SE 9601855
US19960018874P29.05.1996         Original published format: US 18874 P
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1318198
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318198
Date:22.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/79, C07K14/755
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines rekombinanten Polypeptids unter Hinzufügung eines Chymotrypsinhemmstoffes zum Zellkulturmedium[2003/24]
English:Process for producing a recombinant polypeptide involving the addition of an inhibitor of chymotrypsins to the cell culture medium[2003/24]
French:Procédé pour produire un polypeptide recombine comprenant l'addition d'un inhibiteur de chymotrypsines au milieu de culture cellulaire[2003/24]
Examination procedure10.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
21.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2006Fee for grant paid
05.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97923382.2  / EP0934424
Opposition(s)27.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/09]
Request for further processing for:28.01.2004Request for further processing filed
28.01.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.02.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
07.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
10.01.200303   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.2003
10.01.200304   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.2003
10.01.200305   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.2003
10.01.200306   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.2003
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/39]IT22.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[DY]WO9002175  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [DY] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [DY]WO9109122  (KABIVITRUM AB [SE]) [DY] 7,8 * the whole document *
 [DY]  TOKUNAGA M ET AL, "SECRETION OF MOUSE ALPHA-AMYLASE FROM FISSION YEAST SCHIZOSACCHAROMYCES POMBE: PRESENCE OF CHYMOSTATIN-SENSITIVE PROTEASE ACTIVITY IN THE CULTURE MEDIUM", YEAST, CHICHESTER, SUSSEX, GB, (1993), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 0749-503X, pages 379 - 387, XP001120729 [DY] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/yea.320090408