Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1441499

EP1441499 - Device and method for generating metadata from essence [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.11.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings
3 rue du Colonel Moll
75017 Paris / FR
[2018/40]
Former [2017/46]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing DTV
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Former [2017/45]For all designated states
THOMSON Licensing
1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Former [2004/31]For all designated states
DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH
Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Li, Hui, Dr.
Haltenhoffstrasse 221
30419 Hannover / DE
02 / Blawat, Meinolf
Sutelstrasse 54C
30659 Hannover / DE
03 / Janssen, Uwe
Niedersachsenstrasse 53
30926 Seelze / DE
04 / Kubsch, Stefan
Rehrener Strasse 1
31559 Hohnhorst / DE
05 / Hepper, Dietmar
Wernigeroder Weg 41
30419 Hannover / DE
 [2004/31]
Representative(s)Tarquis-Guillou, Anne
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
20, rue Rouget de Lisle
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Rittner, Karsten
Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Former [2004/31]Rittner, Karsten, Dr.
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date03001175.321.01.2003
[2004/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1441499
Date:28.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/21
[2004/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/16]
Former [2004/31]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum erstellen von Metadaten vom Inhalt[2004/31]
English:Device and method for generating metadata from essence[2004/31]
French:Procédé et dispositif permettant l'élaboration de metadonnées de contenu[2004/31]
Examination procedure07.01.2005Examination requested  [2005/10]
29.01.2005Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.06.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR
22.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
26.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
26.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
27.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
19.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
24.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
22.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
24.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
24.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 17
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.03.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005BG   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005CZ   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005EE   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005HU   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005SI   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005SK   M01   Not yet paid
08.03.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002135621  (ANGIULO MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [X]US2002167683  (HANAMOTO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] , [0042] , [0046] - [0050] - [0054] - [0060] *;
 [A]US6353823  (KUMAR ARUNA [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]US6055543  (CHRISTENSEN STEVE W [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *