blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1331096

EP1331096 - Liquid container [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/31]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2 Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamamoto, Hajime
Canon Kabushiki K., 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Shimizu, Eiichiro
Canon Kabushiki K., 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Miyauchi, Shinichi
Canon Kabushiki K., 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Sugimura, Yoshihiko
Canon Kabushiki K., 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
 [2003/31]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2003/31]Böckelen, Rainer
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner (GbR), TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date03001528.323.01.2003
[2003/31]
Priority number, dateJP2002001695325.01.2002         Original published format: JP 2002016953
[2003/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1331096
Date:30.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1331096
Date:17.12.2003
[2003/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1331096
Date:29.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/53]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2003
ClassificationIPC:B41J2/175, B65D5/72
[2003/51]
CPC:
B41J2/17553 (EP,US); B41J2/175 (KR); B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/1752 (EP,US); B41J2/17546 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2003/31]B41J2/175
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/31]
TitleGerman:Flüssigkeitsbehälter[2003/31]
English:Liquid container[2003/31]
French:Réservoir de liquide[2003/31]
Examination procedure23.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/31]
14.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2004Fee for grant paid
21.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
BG29.12.2004
CZ29.12.2004
EE29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
SI29.12.2004
SK29.12.2004
TR29.12.2004
CY23.01.2005
LU23.01.2005
IE24.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
DK29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
SE29.03.2005
HU30.03.2005
ES09.04.2005
PT29.05.2005
[2008/04]
Former [2007/20]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
BG29.12.2004
CZ29.12.2004
EE29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
SI29.12.2004
SK29.12.2004
TR29.12.2004
CY23.01.2005
LU23.01.2005
IE24.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
DK29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
SE29.03.2005
HU30.03.2005
ES09.04.2005
Former [2007/12]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
BG29.12.2004
CZ29.12.2004
EE29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
SI29.12.2004
SK29.12.2004
TR29.12.2004
LU23.01.2005
IE24.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
DK29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
SE29.03.2005
HU30.03.2005
ES09.04.2005
Former [2006/52]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
BG29.12.2004
CZ29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
SI29.12.2004
SK29.12.2004
TR29.12.2004
IE24.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
DK29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
HU30.03.2005
ES09.04.2005
Former [2006/35]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
BG29.12.2004
CZ29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
SI29.12.2004
SK29.12.2004
IE24.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
DK29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
HU30.03.2005
ES09.04.2005
Former [2006/23]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
BG29.12.2004
CZ29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
SI29.12.2004
SK29.12.2004
IE24.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
DK29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
ES09.04.2005
Former [2006/14]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
BG29.12.2004
CZ29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
SI29.12.2004
SK29.12.2004
MC31.01.2005
DK29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
ES09.04.2005
Former [2006/12]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
BG29.12.2004
CZ29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
SI29.12.2004
SK29.12.2004
DK29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
ES09.04.2005
Former [2005/51]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
BG29.12.2004
CZ29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
SI29.12.2004
SK29.12.2004
GR29.03.2005
Former [2005/50]AT29.12.2004
BG29.12.2004
CZ29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
SI29.12.2004
SK29.12.2004
GR29.03.2005
Former [2005/48]AT29.12.2004
BG29.12.2004
CZ29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
SK29.12.2004
GR29.03.2005
Former [2005/46]AT29.12.2004
BG29.12.2004
CZ29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
GR29.03.2005
Former [2005/36]AT29.12.2004
BG29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
GR29.03.2005
Former [2005/30]BG29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
GR29.03.2005
Former [2005/26]FI29.12.2004
GR29.03.2005
Former [2005/24]FI29.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2001001545  ;
 [A]JPH11310234  ;
 [A]JPH0752399
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010508), vol. 2000, no. 16, & JP2001001545 A 20010109 (CANON INC) [A] 1-18 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11310234 A 19991109 (NIHON TETRAPAK KK) [A] 1-18 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 05, & JP07052399 A 19950228 (CANON INC) [A] 1-18 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.