blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1342412

EP1342412 - Triclinic metazachlor and process for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  27.11.2009
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Feinchemie Schwebda GmbH
Strassburger Strasse 5
37269 Eschwege / DE
[2007/39]
Former [2003/37]For all designated states
Feinchemie Schwebda GmbH
Strassburger Strasse 5
37269 Eschwege / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schnell, Michael, Dr.
Strassburger Strasse 5
37269 Eschwege / DE
 [2003/37]
Representative(s)Gesthuysen Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Huyssenallee 68
45128 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/37]Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert
Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100
45128 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date03001599.424.01.2003
[2003/37]
Priority number, dateDE2002101040909.03.2002         Original published format: DE 10210409
[2003/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1342412
Date:10.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1342412
Date:26.09.2007
Language:DE
[2007/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2003
ClassificationIPC:A01N43/56, C07D231/12
[2003/37]
CPC:
C07D231/12 (EP); C07D233/56 (EP); C07D249/08 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/37]
TitleGerman:Rein triklines Metazachlor und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[2003/37]
English:Triclinic metazachlor and process for its preparation[2003/37]
French:Métazachlore triclinique et procédé pour sa préparation[2003/37]
Examination procedure18.08.2003Examination requested  [2003/42]
11.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.07.2007Fee for grant paid
17.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.06.2008   
MAC - GmbH
Alte Landstrasse 15
88138 Sigmarszell / DE
Opponent's representative
Luderschmidt, Wolfgang
Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
 02  23.06.2008  03.07.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Realchemie Nederland B.V.
Pastoor Harksplein 27
5614 HX Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
Scholz, Volker
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
 03  24.06.2008   
GAT Microencapsulation AG
Gewerbezone 1
2490 Ebenfurth / AT
 04  26.06.2008    ADMISSIBLE
Realchemie Nederland B.V.
Pastoor Harksplein 27
5614 HX Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
Weisbrodt, Bernd
Ring & Weisbrodt Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Hohe Strasse 33
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/32]
Opponent(s)01  23.06.2008   
MAC - GmbH
Alte Landstrasse 15
88138 Sigmarszell / DE
Opponent's representative
Luderschmidt, Wolfgang
John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
 02  23.06.2008  03.07.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Realchemie Nederland B.V.
Pastoor Harksplein 27
5614 HX Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
Scholz, Volker
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
 03  24.06.2008   
GAT Microencapsulation AG
Gewerbezone 1
2490 Ebenfurth / AT
 04  26.06.2008    ADMISSIBLE
Realchemie Nederland B.V.
Pastoor Harksplein 27
5614 HX Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
Weisbrodt, Bernd
Ring & Weisbrodt Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Münzstrasse 34
47051 Duisburg / DE
Former [2008/31]
Opponent(s)01  23.06.2008    ADMISSIBLE
MAC - GmbH
Alte Landstrasse 15
88138 Sigmarszell / DE
Opponent's representative
Luderschmidt, Wolfgang
John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
 02  23.06.2008    ADMISSIBLE
Realchemie Nederland B.V.
Pastoor Harksplein 27
5614 HX Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
Scholz, Volker
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
 03  24.06.2008    ADMISSIBLE
GAT Microencapsulation AG
Gewerbezone 1
2490 Ebenfurth / AT
04.08.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.08.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.02.2010
07.08.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.08.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
23.08.2009Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/53]
04.02.2010Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
GB26.09.2007
IE26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
TR26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
AT24.01.2008
LU24.01.2008
BE31.01.2008
CH31.01.2008
IT31.01.2008
LI31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
HU27.03.2008
FR04.07.2008
DE01.08.2009
[2011/13]
Former [2010/37]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
GB26.09.2007
IE26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
TR26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
AT24.01.2008
LU24.01.2008
BE31.01.2008
CH31.01.2008
LI31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
HU27.03.2008
FR04.07.2008
DE01.08.2009
Former [2010/34]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
GB26.09.2007
IE26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
AT24.01.2008
LU24.01.2008
BE31.01.2008
CH31.01.2008
LI31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
HU27.03.2008
FR04.07.2008
DE01.08.2009
Former [2010/32]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
GB26.09.2007
IE26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
AT24.01.2008
LU24.01.2008
BE31.01.2008
CH31.01.2008
LI31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
FR04.07.2008
DE01.08.2009
Former [2009/48]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
GB26.09.2007
IE26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
AT24.01.2008
BE31.01.2008
CH31.01.2008
LI31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
FR04.07.2008
DE01.08.2009
Former [2009/38]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
GB26.09.2007
IE26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
AT24.01.2008
BE31.01.2008
CH31.01.2008
LI31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
FR04.07.2008
Former [2009/34]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
GB26.09.2007
IE26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
AT24.01.2008
BE31.01.2008
CH31.01.2008
LI31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
FR04.07.2008
Former [2009/29]CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
GB26.09.2007
IE26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
AT24.01.2008
BE31.01.2008
CH31.01.2008
LI31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
FR04.07.2008
Former [2009/23]CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
GB26.09.2007
IE26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
AT24.01.2008
BE31.01.2008
CH31.01.2008
LI31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
FR04.07.2008
Former [2009/14]CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
GB26.09.2007
IE26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
BE31.01.2008
CH31.01.2008
LI31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
FR04.07.2008
Former [2009/10]CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
GB26.09.2007
IE26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
CH31.01.2008
LI31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
FR04.07.2008
Former [2009/03]CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
GB26.09.2007
IE26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
CH31.01.2008
LI31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
FR04.07.2008
Former [2008/48]CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
IE26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
CH31.01.2008
LI31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
FR04.07.2008
Former [2008/45]CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
IE26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
Former [2008/40]CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
Former [2008/35]CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
Former [2008/28]CZ26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
SE26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
Former [2008/24]CZ26.09.2007
FI26.09.2007
NL26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
GR27.12.2007
ES06.01.2008
PT26.02.2008
Former [2008/22]FI26.09.2007
GR27.12.2007
Former [2008/10]FI26.09.2007
Documents cited:Search[XDA]EP0012216  (BASF AG [DE]) [XD] 1-3 * examples 6-9; claim 1 * * examples 1-4 * [A] 4-12;
 [XDA]EP0411408  (BASF AG [DE]) [XD] 1-3 * paragraph [0002] * * the whole document * [A] 4-12;
 [X]WO9610913  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 13 * claim 1 *;
 [XP]WO02058471  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [XP] 13* claim 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.