EP1317131 - Storage medium, recording apparatus, playback apparatus, recording method, and computer-readable storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Date, Akira 14-23-205, Naka-1-chome Kunitachi-shi / JP | 02 /
Kageyama, Masahiro 1-14-91-1118 Tamadaira Hino-Shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ito, Tamotsu 4-6503, Kamitsuchidanaminami-3-chome Ayase-shi / JP | [2003/39] |
Former [2003/23] | 01 /
Date, Akira 14-23-205, Naka-1-chome Kunitachi-shi / JP | ||
02 /
Kageyama, Masahiro 32-D202, Koyasumachi-2-chome Hachioji-shi / JP | |||
03 /
Ito, Tamotsu 4-6503, Kamitsuchidanaminami-3-chome Ayase-shi / JP | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03001934.3 | 05.08.1999 | [2003/23] | Priority number, date | JP19980224009 | 07.08.1998 Original published format: JP 22400998 | JP19980233837 | 20.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23383798 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1317131 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/21 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
H04N1/2166 (EP,US);
G11B7/00 (KR);
G06F16/58 (EP,US);
G11B27/036 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/322 (EP,US);
G11B27/326 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
H04N9/8047 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2575 (EP,US);
G11B2220/65 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3214 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3215 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3225 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3226 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3247 (EP,US);
H04N2201/325 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3254 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3274 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N9/8063 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/09] |
Former [2003/23] | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Speichermedium, Aufzeichnungsgerät, Wiedergabegerät, Aufzeichnungsverfahren und computerlesbares Speichermedium | [2003/23] | English: | Storage medium, recording apparatus, playback apparatus, recording method, and computer-readable storage medium | [2003/23] | French: | Support d'enregistrement, dispositif d'enregistrement, appareil de reproduction, méthode d'enregistrement et support d'enregistrement lisible par ordinateur | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 16.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/29] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99306229.8 / EP0978994 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990306229) is 26.11.2002 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0379444 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 15 - column 5, line 25 *; | [A]GB2250625 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 3 - page 5, line 8 *; | [AD]EP0599466 (SONY CORP [JP]) [AD] 1-11* the whole document *; | [YDA]EP0802688 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [YD] 1,6,7 * the whole document * [A] 2-5,8-11; | [YDA]WO9817059 (FLASHPOINT TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [YD] 1,6,7 * page 7, line 30 - page 10, line 11 * [A] 2-5,8-11 | by applicant | EP0802688 | WO9817059 |