Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1447066

EP1447066 - Comfortable diaper [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  10.05.2017
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2017Revocation of patentpublished on 14.06.2017  [2017/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Busam, Ludwig
Talstrasse 17
65510 Hünstetten / DE
02 / Becker, Uwe Jürgen
Josef-Gebertz-Strasse 4
53881 Euskirchen / DE
03 / Ehrnsperger, Bruno Johannes
Bonner Strasse 5
65812 Bad Soden / DE
04 / Lindner, Torsten
Im Wiesental 17
61476 Kronberg / DE
05 / Link, Siegfried
InderHoell 4
53937 Schleiden / DE
06 / Maier, Volker
In den Essigbenden 61
53879 Euskirchen / DE
07 / Siddiquee, Sanaul Kabir
40, Champ du Roi
1040 Etterbeek / BE
08 / Stiehl, Gabriele
Neustrasse 3
65824 Schwalbach / DE
09 / Tombuelt, Thomas
Auf Dem Hielig 16
53947 Nettersheim / DE
 [2008/40]
Former [2007/47]01 / Busam, Ludwig
Talstrasse 17
65510 Hünstetten / DE
02 / Becker, Uwe Jürgen
Josef-Gebert-Strasse 4
53881 Euskirchen / DE
03 / Ehrnsperger, Bruno Johannes
Bonner Strasse 5
65812 Bad Soden / DE
04 / Lindner, Torsten
Im Wiesental 17
61476 Kronberg / DE
05 / Link, Siegfried
InderHoell 4
53937 Schleiden / DE
06 / Maier, Volker
In den Essigbenden 61
53879 Euskirchen / DE
07 / Siddiquee, Sanaul Kabir
40, Champ du Roi
1040 Etterbeek / BE
08 / Stiehl, Gabriele
Neustrasse 3
65824 Schwalbach / DE
09 / Tombuelt, Thomas
Auf Dem Hielig 16
53947 Nettersheim / DE
Former [2007/43]01 / Busam, Ludwig
Talstrasse 17
65510 Hünstetten / DE
02 / Becker, Uwe Jürgen
Josef-Gebert-Strasse 4
53881 Euskirchen / DE
03 / Ehrnsperger, Bruno Johannes
Bonner Strasse 5
65812 Bad Soden / DE
04 / Lindner, Torsten
Im Wiesental 17
61476 Kronberg / DE
05 / Link, Siegfried
InderHoell 4
53937 Schleiden / DE
06 / Maier, Volker
In den Essigbenden 61
53879 Euskirchen / DE
07 / Siddiquee, Sanaul Kabir
Rue De Tervaete 27
1000 Brussels / BE
08 / Stiehl, Gabriele
Neustrasse 3
65824 Schwalbach / DE
09 / Tombuelt, Thomas
Auf Dem Hielig 16
53947 Nettersheim / DE
Former [2007/38]01 / Busam, Ludwig
Talstrasse 17
65510 Hünstetten / DE
02 / Becker, Uwe Jürgen
Josef-Gebert-Strasse 4
53881 Euskirchen / DE
03 / Ehrnsperger, Bruno Johannes
Bonner Strasse 5
65812 Bad Soden / DE
04 / Lindner, Torsten
Im Wiesental 17
61476 Kronberg / DE
05 / Link, Siegfried
InderHoell 4
53973 Schneiden / DE
06 / Maier, Volker
In den Essigbenden 61
53879 Euskirchen / DE
07 / Siddiquee, Sanaul Kabir
Rue De Tervaete 27
1000 Brussels / BE
08 / Stiehl, Gabriele
Neustrasse 3
65824 Schwalbach / DE
09 / Tombuelt, Thomas
Auf Dem Hielig 16
53947 Nettersheim / DE
Former [2004/34]01 / Busam, Ludwig
Talstrasse 17
65510 Hünstetten / DE
02 / Becker, Uwe Jürgen
Josef-Gebert-Strasse 4
53881 Euskirchen / DE
03 / Ehrnsperger, Bruno Johannes
Bonner Strasse 5
65812 Bad Soden / DE
04 / Lindner, Torsten
Im Wiesental 17
61476 Kronberg / DE
Representative(s)Anderson, James Edward George , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/28]Anderson, James Edward George , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2013/25]Portch, Daniel , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2009/34]Boon, Graham Anthony , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2008/39]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2006/12]Boon, Graham Anthony , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2004/34]Borbach, Markus , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40
65823 Schwalbach / DE
Application number, filing date03002677.712.02.2003
[2004/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1447066
Date:18.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1447066
Date:01.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/532, A61F13/535, A61F13/539, A61F13/534, A61F13/15
[2013/07]
Former International [2004/34]A61F13/15
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/34]
TitleGerman:Bequem Windel[2004/34]
English:Comfortable diaper[2004/34]
French:Couche-coulotte confortable[2004/34]
Examination procedure26.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/44]
07.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2008Fee for grant paid
29.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07106410.9  / EP1813236
EP07106411.7  / EP1813237
EP07106412.5  / EP1808152
EP08104852.2  / EP1982678
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.06.2009  30.06.2009  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
 02  01.07.2009  13.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 [2017/02]
Former [2009/32]
Opponent(s)01  24.06.2009  30.06.2009  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Egeröd, Lisbeth
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Gothenburg / SE
 02  01.07.2009   
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2009/31]
Opponent(s)01  24.06.2009   
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Egeröd, Lisbeth
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Gothenburg / SE
07.08.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.04.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.12.2012Date of oral proceedings
23.01.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.01.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.04.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
06.05.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/24]
Appeal following opposition27.03.2013Appeal received No.  T0744/13
29.05.2013Statement of grounds filed
18.04.2017Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
22.03.2013Appeal received No.  T0744/13
21.05.2013Statement of grounds filed
18.04.2017Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
Request for further processing for:20.01.2006Request for further processing filed
20.01.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.02.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
05.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
CY01.10.2008
CZ01.10.2008
DK01.10.2008
EE01.10.2008
FI01.10.2008
SI01.10.2008
SK01.10.2008
BG01.01.2009
SE01.01.2009
GR02.01.2009
IE12.02.2009
LU12.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
PT02.03.2009
HU02.04.2009
[2015/21]
Former [2011/31]AT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
CZ01.10.2008
DK01.10.2008
EE01.10.2008
FI01.10.2008
SI01.10.2008
SK01.10.2008
BG01.01.2009
SE01.01.2009
GR02.01.2009
IE12.02.2009
LU12.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
PT02.03.2009
HU02.04.2009
Former [2011/21]AT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
CZ01.10.2008
DK01.10.2008
EE01.10.2008
FI01.10.2008
SI01.10.2008
SK01.10.2008
BG01.01.2009
SE01.01.2009
GR02.01.2009
IE12.02.2009
LU12.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
PT02.03.2009
Former [2010/48]AT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
CZ01.10.2008
DK01.10.2008
EE01.10.2008
FI01.10.2008
SI01.10.2008
SK01.10.2008
BG01.01.2009
SE01.01.2009
GR02.01.2009
IE12.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
PT02.03.2009
Former [2010/07]AT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
CZ01.10.2008
DK01.10.2008
EE01.10.2008
FI01.10.2008
SI01.10.2008
SK01.10.2008
BG01.01.2009
SE01.01.2009
IE12.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
PT02.03.2009
Former [2009/47]AT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
CZ01.10.2008
DK01.10.2008
EE01.10.2008
FI01.10.2008
SI01.10.2008
SK01.10.2008
BG01.01.2009
SE01.01.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
PT02.03.2009
Former [2009/43]AT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
CZ01.10.2008
DK01.10.2008
EE01.10.2008
FI01.10.2008
SI01.10.2008
SK01.10.2008
BG01.01.2009
SE01.01.2009
MC28.02.2009
PT02.03.2009
Former [2009/42]AT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
CZ01.10.2008
DK01.10.2008
EE01.10.2008
FI01.10.2008
SI01.10.2008
BG01.01.2009
SE01.01.2009
MC28.02.2009
PT02.03.2009
Former [2009/39]AT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
CZ01.10.2008
DK01.10.2008
EE01.10.2008
FI01.10.2008
SI01.10.2008
BG01.01.2009
SE01.01.2009
PT02.03.2009
Former [2009/38]AT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
DK01.10.2008
EE01.10.2008
FI01.10.2008
SI01.10.2008
BG01.01.2009
SE01.01.2009
PT02.03.2009
Former [2009/36]AT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
DK01.10.2008
EE01.10.2008
FI01.10.2008
SI01.10.2008
BG01.01.2009
PT02.03.2009
Former [2009/34]AT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
DK01.10.2008
FI01.10.2008
SI01.10.2008
BG01.01.2009
PT02.03.2009
Former [2009/32]AT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
FI01.10.2008
SI01.10.2008
BG01.01.2009
PT02.03.2009
Former [2009/25]AT01.10.2008
FI01.10.2008
SI01.10.2008
BG01.01.2009
PT02.03.2009
Former [2009/23]AT01.10.2008
SI01.10.2008
BG01.01.2009
Former [2009/16]SI01.10.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]US5425725  (TANZER RICHARD W [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 19, line 53 - column 22, line 29; figure - * * column 13, line 28 - column 14, line 37 * * column 28, line 66 - column 29, line 6 *;
 [X]US2002102392  (FISH JEFFREY E [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0069]; figure - *;
 [X]US6231556  (OSBORN III THOMAS WARD [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 11, line 50 - column 21, line 25; figure - *;
 [X]US3670731  (HARMON CARLYLE) [X] 1-5,7-10 * column 4, line 71 - column 6, line 6; figures 4-6 *;
 [X]US2002115969  (MAEDA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0120]; figure - *;
 [X]US4055180  (KARAMI HAMZEH) [X] 1-5,7-10 * column 3, line 23 - line 48 * * column 6, line 25 - line 51; figure - *;
 [X]US6258996  (GOLDMAN STEPHEN ALLEN [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 36, line 49 - column 49, line 38; figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]US4381783  (ELIAS ROBERT T) [AD] 1-10 * column W *