Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1348457

EP1348457 - Method of determining of a treatment parameter on a hemofiltration apparatus and hemodialysis apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2006
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg v.d.H. / DE
[2003/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Gross, Malte, Dr.
Breslaustrasse 44
97424 Schweinfurt / DE
02 / Maierhofer, Andreas, Dr.
Hoefelstrasse 22
97422 Schweinfurt / DE
 [2003/40]
Representative(s)Dreyhsig, Jörg
Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA
Global Intellectual Property
Frankfurter Strasse 6-8
66606 St. Wendel / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/52]Dreyhsig, Jörg, Dr.
Fresenius Medical Care AG, Patent Department, Frankfurter Strasse 6-8
66606 St. Wendel / DE
Application number, filing date03002947.411.02.2003
[2003/40]
Priority number, dateDE200211224719.03.2002         Original published format: DE 10212247
[2003/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1348457
Date:01.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1348457
Date:25.05.2005
Language:DE
[2005/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/16
[2003/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/40]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bestimmung eines Behandlungsparameters an einer Hämofiltrationsvorrichtung und Hämofiltrationsvorrichtung zur Anwendung des Verfahrens[2003/40]
English:Method of determining of a treatment parameter on a hemofiltration apparatus and hemodialysis apparatus therefor[2003/40]
French:Méthode pour déterminer des paramètres de traitement utilisant un appareil d'hémofiltration et dispositif pour cela[2003/40]
Examination procedure01.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/23]
05.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2004Fee for grant paid
15.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.05.2005
CZ25.05.2005
EE25.05.2005
SI25.05.2005
SK25.05.2005
BG25.08.2005
HU26.11.2005
[2009/02]
Former [2008/28]CZ25.05.2005
EE25.05.2005
SI25.05.2005
SK25.05.2005
BG25.08.2005
HU26.11.2005
Former [2007/12]CZ25.05.2005
SI25.05.2005
SK25.05.2005
BG25.08.2005
HU26.11.2005
Former [2006/31]CZ25.05.2005
SI25.05.2005
SK25.05.2005
BG25.08.2005
Former [2006/15]CZ25.05.2005
SI25.05.2005
BG25.08.2005
Former [2006/13]SI25.05.2005
BG25.08.2005
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0930080  (FRESENIUS AG) [AD] 1-29 * figure 2 * * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 22 * * column 7, lines 3-43 *;
 [AD]EP1062960  (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH) [AD] 1-9 * paragraphs [0031] - [0039] *;
 [A]DE19831385  (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH) [A] 1-9 * page 5, lines 28-47 *