blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1341196

EP1341196 - Electrolytic composition, photoelectric conversion device and photoelectric cell [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2008
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.09.2010  [2010/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/11]For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2003/36]For all designated states
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ono, Michio, Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
210 Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
 [2003/36]
Representative(s)Solf, Alexander
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/36]Solf, Alexander, Dr.
Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date03003188.419.02.2003
[2003/36]
Priority number, dateJP2002005214727.02.2002         Original published format: JP 2002052147
[2003/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1341196
Date:03.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP1341196
Date:03.12.2003
[2003/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1341196
Date:03.11.2004
[2004/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1341196
Date:04.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/14]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1341196
Date:27.02.2008
[2008/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2004
ClassificationIPC:H01G9/20
[2003/36]
CPC:
H01G9/2009 (EP); H01G9/2031 (EP); Y02E10/542 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/36]
TitleGerman:Elektrolytzusammensetzung, Vorrichtung zur photoelektrischen Umwandlung und photoelektrische Zelle[2006/35]
English:Electrolytic composition, photoelectric conversion device and photoelectric cell[2003/36]
French:Composition électrolytique, dispositif pour la conversion photoélectrique et cellule photoélectrique[2006/35]
Former [2003/36]Elektrolytzusammensetzung für eine Photoelektrochemische Zelle
Former [2003/36]Composition électrolytique pour une cellule électrochimique
Examination procedure21.12.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/08]
08.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
14.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2006Fee for grant paid
21.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
19.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.04.2007
BE04.04.2007
CH04.04.2007
CY04.04.2007
CZ04.04.2007
DK04.04.2007
EE04.04.2007
FI04.04.2007
FR04.04.2007
IT04.04.2007
LI04.04.2007
NL04.04.2007
SI04.04.2007
SK04.04.2007
TR04.04.2007
BG04.07.2007
SE04.07.2007
GR05.07.2007
ES15.07.2007
PT04.09.2007
HU05.10.2007
[2010/37]
Former [2010/34]AT04.04.2007
BE04.04.2007
CH04.04.2007
CY04.04.2007
CZ04.04.2007
DK04.04.2007
EE04.04.2007
FI04.04.2007
FR04.04.2007
IT04.04.2007
LI04.04.2007
NL04.04.2007
SI04.04.2007
SK04.04.2007
BG04.07.2007
SE04.07.2007
GR05.07.2007
ES15.07.2007
PT04.09.2007
HU05.10.2007
Former [2009/34]AT04.04.2007
BE04.04.2007
CH04.04.2007
CY04.04.2007
CZ04.04.2007
DK04.04.2007
EE04.04.2007
FI04.04.2007
FR04.04.2007
IT04.04.2007
LI04.04.2007
NL04.04.2007
SI04.04.2007
SK04.04.2007
BG04.07.2007
SE04.07.2007
GR05.07.2007
ES15.07.2007
PT04.09.2007
Former [2009/10]AT04.04.2007
BE04.04.2007
CH04.04.2007
CZ04.04.2007
DK04.04.2007
EE04.04.2007
FI04.04.2007
FR04.04.2007
IT04.04.2007
LI04.04.2007
NL04.04.2007
SI04.04.2007
SK04.04.2007
BG04.07.2007
SE04.07.2007
GR05.07.2007
ES15.07.2007
PT04.09.2007
Former [2008/52]AT04.04.2007
BE04.04.2007
CH04.04.2007
CZ04.04.2007
DK04.04.2007
FI04.04.2007
FR04.04.2007
IT04.04.2007
LI04.04.2007
NL04.04.2007
SI04.04.2007
SK04.04.2007
BG04.07.2007
SE04.07.2007
GR05.07.2007
ES15.07.2007
PT04.09.2007
Former [2008/23]AT04.04.2007
BE04.04.2007
CH04.04.2007
CZ04.04.2007
DK04.04.2007
FI04.04.2007
IT04.04.2007
LI04.04.2007
NL04.04.2007
SI04.04.2007
SK04.04.2007
BG04.07.2007
SE04.07.2007
GR05.07.2007
ES15.07.2007
PT04.09.2007
FR30.11.2007
Former [2008/22]AT04.04.2007
BE04.04.2007
CH04.04.2007
CZ04.04.2007
DK04.04.2007
FI04.04.2007
IT04.04.2007
LI04.04.2007
NL04.04.2007
SI04.04.2007
SK04.04.2007
BG04.07.2007
SE04.07.2007
GR05.07.2007
ES15.07.2007
PT04.09.2007
Former [2008/13]AT04.04.2007
BE04.04.2007
CH04.04.2007
CZ04.04.2007
DK04.04.2007
FI04.04.2007
LI04.04.2007
NL04.04.2007
SI04.04.2007
SK04.04.2007
BG04.07.2007
SE04.07.2007
ES15.07.2007
PT04.09.2007
Former [2008/10]AT04.04.2007
BE04.04.2007
CH04.04.2007
CZ04.04.2007
DK04.04.2007
FI04.04.2007
LI04.04.2007
NL04.04.2007
SI04.04.2007
BG04.07.2007
SE04.07.2007
ES15.07.2007
PT04.09.2007
Former [2008/09]AT04.04.2007
BE04.04.2007
CH04.04.2007
DK04.04.2007
FI04.04.2007
LI04.04.2007
NL04.04.2007
SI04.04.2007
BG04.07.2007
SE04.07.2007
ES15.07.2007
PT04.09.2007
Former [2008/08]AT04.04.2007
BE04.04.2007
CH04.04.2007
DK04.04.2007
FI04.04.2007
LI04.04.2007
SI04.04.2007
SE04.07.2007
ES15.07.2007
PT04.09.2007
Former [2008/04]AT04.04.2007
BE04.04.2007
CH04.04.2007
FI04.04.2007
LI04.04.2007
SI04.04.2007
SE04.07.2007
ES15.07.2007
PT04.09.2007
Former [2007/50]AT04.04.2007
CH04.04.2007
FI04.04.2007
LI04.04.2007
SI04.04.2007
SE04.07.2007
ES15.07.2007
PT04.09.2007
Former [2007/49]CH04.04.2007
FI04.04.2007
LI04.04.2007
SI04.04.2007
SE04.07.2007
ES15.07.2007
PT04.09.2007
Former [2007/46]SI04.04.2007
ES15.07.2007
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - PAPAGEORGIOU N ET AL, "The Performance and Stability of Ambient Temperature Molten Salts for Solar Cell Applications", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE, US, (199610), vol. 143, no. 10, ISSN 0013-4651, pages 3099 - 3108, XP002118482 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1837171
 [Y]  - STATHATOS E ET AL, "DYE-SENSITIZED PHOTOELECTROCHEMICAL CELL USING A NANOCOMPOSITE SIO2/POLY(ETHYLENE GLYCOL) THIN FILM AS ELECTROLYTE SUPPORT. CHARACTERIZATION BY TIME-RESOLVED LUMINESCENCE AND CONDUCTIVITY MEASUREMENTS", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY. B, MATERIALS, SURFACES, INTERFACES AND BIOPHYSICAL, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (2001), vol. 105, ISSN 1089-5647, pages 3486 - 3492, XP001011482 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp0020642
 [A]  - KUBO W ET AL, "QUASI-SOLID-STATE DYE-SENSIZITED SOLAR CELLS USING ROOM TEMPERATURE MOLTEN SALTS AND A LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT GELATOR", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS - CHEMCOM, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, GB, (20020221), vol. 4, ISSN 1359-7345, pages 374 - 375, XP001172440 [A] 1-3 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b110019j
 [PX]  - KONNO A ET AL, "EFFECT OF IMIDAZOLIUM SALTS ON THE PERFORMANCE OF SOLID-STATE DYE-SENSITIZED PHOTOVOLTAIC CELL USING COPPER IODIDE AS A HOLE COLLECTOR", ELECTROCHEMISTRY, ELECTROCHEMISTRY SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO, JP, (200206), vol. 70, no. 6, pages 432 - 434, XP008023568 [PX] 1-3 * figure 2f *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.