Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1348445

EP1348445 - Method for separating viruses from a protein solution by nanofiltration [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.03.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.05.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CSL Behring GmbH
Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
[2007/12]
Former [2004/35]For all designated states
ZLB Behring GmbH
Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
Former [2003/40]For all designated states
Aventis Behring GmbH
Postfach 1230
35002 Marburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Lengsfeld, Thomas
Am Hasenkueppel 20 e
35041 Marburg / DE
02 / Schneider, Heinrich
Im Stelefeld 20
35094 Lahntal / DE
 [2003/40]
Representative(s)Pohlman, Sandra M.
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
[2014/19]
Application number, filing date03003632.118.02.2003
[2003/40]
Priority number, dateDE2002101163215.03.2002         Original published format: DE 10211632
[2003/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1348445
Date:01.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1348445
Date:10.04.2013
Language:DE
[2013/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61L2/00
[2003/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/40]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Abtrennung von Viren aus einer Proteinlösung durch Nanofiltration[2003/40]
English:Method for separating viruses from a protein solution by nanofiltration[2003/40]
French:Procédé de séparation de virus d'une suspension de protéines par nanofiltration[2003/40]
Examination procedure01.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/23]
06.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2013Fee for grant paid
28.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.08.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.01.2014  24.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Octapharma AG
Seidenstrasse 2
8853 Lachen / CH
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 02  10.01.2014  24.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Biotest AG
Landsteinerstrasse 5
63303 Dreieich / DE
Opponent's representative
Wolter, Thomas
Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/08]
Opponent(s)01  10.01.2014   
Octapharma AG
Seidenstrasse 2
8853 Lachen / CH
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 02  10.01.2014   
Biotest AG
Landsteinerstrasse 5
D-63303 Dreieich / DE
Opponent's representative
Wolter, Thomas
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner (GbR) Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
17.02.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.06.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.12.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition01.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0446/16
02.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
20.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0446/16
02.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
12.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
29.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
02.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
01.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.02.2003
CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
MC10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
PT12.08.2013
[2016/32]
Former [2014/44]CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
MC10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2014/10]CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2014/09]CY10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/52]CY10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/50]FI10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/49]FI10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
GR11.07.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/47]SI10.04.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/37]SI10.04.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1136084  (AVENTIS BEHRING GMBH) [X] 1-4 * examples 2,4; claim - *;
 [X]WO9964441  (TOELOE HANNELE ;PARKKINEN JAAKKO (FI); SUOMEN PUNAINEN RISTI VERIP) [X] 1-4 * page 3, line 19 - page 8, line 25; example -; claim - *;
 [X]WO9919343  (MILLIPORE CORP ;ORTHO DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC (US)) [X] 1-4 * page 8, line 19 - page 11, line 20; claim - *;
 [Y]WO9923111  (HAEMACURE CORP) [Y] 1-4 * figure 1; example -; claim - *;
 [Y]EP1153608  (AVENTIS BEHRING GMBH) [Y] 1-4 * claim - *;
 [Y]WO0029041  (CENTEON PHARMA GMBH ;GRONSKI PETER (DE); METZNER HUBERT (DE)) [Y] 1-4 * page 2, line 28 - page 8, line 32 *
Examination   - BURNOUF-RADOSEVICH M ET AL, "NANOFILTRATION, A NEW SPECIFIC VIRUS ELIMINATION METHOD APPLIED TO HIGH-PURITY FACTOR IX AND FACTOR XI CONCENTRATES", VOX SANGUINIS, S. KARGER AG, BASEL, CH, (19940801), vol. 67, no. 2, ISSN 0042-9007, pages 132 - 138, XP000609860
by applicant   - M. BURNOUF-RADOSEVICH ET AL., VOX SANG, (1994), vol. 67, pages 132 - 138
    - ROBERTS, P., VOX SANG, (1995), vol. 69, pages 82 - 83