Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1449535

EP1449535 - Compositions comprising fetal hemoglobin and bacterial endotoxin and optionally additional fetal liver components [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2007
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Clinique La Prairie Research SA
5, Boulevard de la Foire
1528 Luxembourg / LU
[2004/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Westphal, Otto
Chemin de Ballallaz 18
1820 Montreux / CH
02 / Hartmann, Alfred
Laubholzstr. 73
8703 Erlenbach / CH
03 / Müller, Silke
Langenbrücken, Donauschwabenstr. 3A
76669 Schönborn / DE
04 / Wälli, Thierry
Clinique La Prairie
1815 Clarens-Montreux / CH
05 / Mach, Jean-Pierre
Department of Biochemistry, University of Lausanne
Chemin des Boveresses 155 1066 Epalinges / CH
06 / Bessler, Wolfgang Inst.f.Mol.Med.u.Zellforschung
AG Tumorimmun./Vakzine Albert-Ludwigs-Universität
Stefan-Meier-Str.8 79104 Freiburg i.Br. / DE
07 / Vor dem Esche, Ulrich Inst.f.Mol.Med.u.Zellforsch.
AG Tumorimmun./Vakzine Albert-Ludwigs-Universität
Stefan-Meier-Str. 8 79104 Freiburg i.Br. / DE
08 / Verdini, Antonio
Viale Marconi 29
47011 Castrocarro Terme (Forli) / IT
09 / Hoffmann, Petra Klinikum der Universit.Regensburg
Abteilung Hämatologie Franz-Josef-Strauss-Allee 11
93053 Regensburg / DE
10 / Zähringer, Ulrich Forschungszentrum Borstel
Leibniz-Zentr.für Medizin und Biowissenschaften
Parkallee 22 23845 Borstel / DE
11 / Alexander, Christian Forschungszentrum Borstel
Leibniz-Zentrum für Medizin und Biowissenschaften
Parkallee 22 23845 Borstel / DE
12 / Ulmer, Artur J. Forschungszentrum Borstel
Leibniz-Zentrum für Medizin und Biowissenschaften
Parkallee 22 23845 Borstel / DE
13 / Gorczynski, Reginald Toronto Hospital
University of Toronto 429 Drewry Avenue
Willowdale, Ontario M2R2K6 / CA
 [2006/05]
Former [2004/43]01 / Westphal, Otto
Chemin de Ballallaz 18
1820 Montreux / CH
02 / Hartmann, Alfred
Laubholzstr. 73
8703 Erlenbach / CH
03 / Müller, Silke
Langenbrücken, Donauschwabenstr. 3A
76669 Schönborn / DE
04 / Wälli, Thierry
Clinique La Prairie
1815 Clarens-Montreux / CH
05 / Mach, Jean-Pierre
Department of Biochemistry, University of Lausanne
Chemin des Boveresses 155 1066 Epalinges / CH
06 / Bessler, Wolfgang Inst.f.Mol.Med.u.Zellforschung
Albert-Ludwigs-Universität Stefan-Meier-Str.8
79104 Freiburg i.Br. / DE
07 / Vor dem Esche, Ulrich Inst. f. Mol. Med. u.
Zellforschung Albert-Ludwigs-Universität
Stefan-Meier-Str. 8 79104 Freiburg i.Br. / DE
08 / Verdini, Antonio
Viale Marconi 29
47011 Castrocarro Terme (Forli) / IT
09 / Hofmann, Petra Klinikum der Universität Regensburg
Abteilung Hämatologie Franz-Josef-Strauss-Allee 11
93053 Regensburg / DE
10 / Zähringer, Ulrich Forschungszentrum Borstel
Leibniz-Zentrum für Medizin Parkallee 22
23845 Borstel / DE
11 / Alexander, Christian Forschungszentrum Borstel
Leibniz-Zentrum für Medizin Parkallee 22
23845 Borstel / DE
12 / Ulmer, Artur J. Forschungszentrum Borstel
Leibniz-Zentrum für Medizin Parkallee 22
23845 Borstel / DE
13 / Gorczynski, Reginald Toronto Hospital
University of Toronto 429 Drewry Avenue
Willowdale, Ontario M2R2K6 / CA
Former [2004/35]01 / Westphal, Otto
Chemin de Ballallaz 18
1820 Montreux / CH
02 / Hartmann, Alfred
Laubholzstr. 73
8703 Erlenbach / CH
03 / Müller, Silke
Langenbrücken, Donauschwabenstr. 3A
76669 Schönborn / DE
04 / Wälli, Thierry
Clinique La Prairie
1815 Clarens-Montreux / CH
05 / Mach, Jean-Pierre
Institute of Biochemistry, University of Lausanne
1011 Lausanne / CH
06 / Bessler, Wolfgang Inst.f.Mol.Med.u.Zellforschung
Albert-Ludwigs-Universität Stefan-Meier-Str.8
79104 Freiburg i.Br. / DE
07 / Eschke, Ulrich
Almendweg 17
79110 Freiburg i.Br. / DE
08 / Verdini, Antonio
Viale Marconi 29
47011 Castrocarro Terme (Forli) / IT
09 / Hofmann, Petra Klinikum der Universität Regensburg
Abteilung Hämatologie Franz-Josef-Strauss-Allee 11
93053 Regensburg / DE
10 / Zähringer, Ulrich Forschungszentrum Borstel
Leibniz-Zentrum für Medizin Parkallee 22
23845 Borstel / DE
11 / Alexander, Christian Forschungszentrum Borstel
Leibniz-Zentrum für Medizin Parkallee 22
23845 Borstel / DE
12 / Ulmer, Artur J. Forschungszentrum Borstel
Leibniz-Zentrum für Medizin Parkallee 22
23845 Borstel / DE
13 / Gorczynski, Reginald Toronto Hospital
University of Toronto 429 Drewry Avenue
Willowdale, Ontario M2R2K6 / CA
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2004/35]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date03003687.518.02.2003
[2004/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1449535
Date:25.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1449535
Date:03.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/00, A61K38/17, A61K38/42, A61K39/02, A61P35/00, A61P37/00
[2004/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/35]
Extension statesAL14.09.2004
LT14.09.2004
LV14.09.2004
MK14.09.2004
RO14.09.2004
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzungen enthaltend fötales Hämoglobin und bakterielles Endotoxin und fakultativ zusätzliche fötale Leberkomponenten[2004/35]
English:Compositions comprising fetal hemoglobin and bacterial endotoxin and optionally additional fetal liver components[2004/35]
French:Compositions comprenant de l' hémoglobine foetale et de l'endotoxine bactérienne et facultativement des composantes additionnelles du foie foetal[2005/50]
Former [2004/35]Compositions comprenant de la hémoglobine foetale et de l'endotoxine bactérienne et facultativement des composantes additionnelles du foie foetal
Examination procedure27.02.2003Examination requested  [2004/35]
23.12.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2005Fee for grant paid
08.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE03.05.2006
CY03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
EE03.05.2006
SI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
TR03.05.2006
BG03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
[2009/42]
Former [2009/38]BE03.05.2006
CY03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
EE03.05.2006
SI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
BG03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2008/38]BE03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
EE03.05.2006
SI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
BG03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2008/31]BE03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
SI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
BG03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2008/21]BE03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
SI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
GR04.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2008/04]BE03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
SI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2007/39]BE03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
IT03.05.2006
SI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2007/13]BE03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
SI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2007/12]CZ03.05.2006
SI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2006/40]SI03.05.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0134648  (BAXTER BIOTECH TECH SARL [CH], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,12,14,15,18,27 * page 24, line 20 - line 29 *;
 [X]WO9513829  (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,14,20,25 * see claims *;
 [X]DE10103211  (KASTNER URSULA [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 6, line 25 - line 44 *;
 [X]US4473647  (CARPENTER CHARLES R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,18,23 * see claims * * column 18, paragraph 1; example 17 *;
 [X]WO9725061  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,12,16,17,19 * page 17, line 25; claims 23-25 *
 [X]  - REGINE J. WESTERWOUDT ET AL., "Improved Fusion Technique. III. The growth promoting activity of lipopolysaccharide, dextran sulfate, and red cell lysate added to Hy-clone calf serum", CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1983), vol. 81, pages 268 - 275, XP009009278 [X] 1-3,8,16 * page 269 * * page 272 * * figure 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-8749(83)90234-4
 [X]  - D'AGNILLO FELICE ET AL, "Synergistic toxicity of acellular hemoglobin and lipopolysaccharide in cultured endothelial cells under oxidative conditions.", BLOOD, 43rd Annual Meeting of the American Society of Hematology, Part 2;Orlando, Florida, USA; December 07-11, 2001, November 16, 2001, (20011116), vol. 98, no. 11 Part 2, ISSN 0006-4971, page 53b, XP001147110 [X] 1-3,8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V98.12.3315