Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1314410

EP1314410 - Multi layered wound dressing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.01.2010
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ConvaTec Technologies Inc.
6100 Neil Road, Suite 500
Reno NV 89511 / US
[2010/08]
Former [2003/22]For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
345 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10154 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Griffiths, Bryan
117 Newhall Road
Upton, Chester, CH2 1TB / GB
02 / Jacques, Elizabeth
9 Cedar Grove
Hoole, Chester CH2 3LQ / GB
03 / Bishop, Stephen, M.
23 Thomas Avenue, St David's Park
Hawarden, Deeside, Flintshire CH5 3TZ / GB
04 / Lydon, Michael, J.
Tennant Farm, The Vownog
Sychdyn, Mold, Flintshire CH7 6EW / GB
 [2003/22]
Representative(s)Wilson Gunn
Blackfriars House The Parsonage
5th Floor
Manchester M3 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/17]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Former [2003/22]Mays, Julie
Barker Brettell, 10-12 Priests Bridge
London SW15 5JE / GB
Application number, filing date03003916.807.01.2000
[2003/22]
Priority number, dateGB1999000034809.01.1999         Original published format: GB 9900348
[2003/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1314410
Date:28.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1314410
Date:05.11.2003
[2003/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1314410
Date:24.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/02
[2003/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/22]
TitleGerman:Mehrschichtige wundauflage[2016/19]
English:Multi layered wound dressing[2003/22]
French:Pansement à couches multiples pour plaies[2003/22]
Former [2003/22]Mehrschichtige wundauflage
Examination procedure21.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/22]
01.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
25.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2009Fee for grant paid
22.12.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.05.2015Observations by third parties
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00906190.4  / EP1139946
Divisional application(s)EP06023739.3  / EP1759677
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.11.2010  10.12.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse
D-89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/30]
Opponent(s)01  23.11.2010  10.12.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse
D-89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Dreiss, et al
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2010/52]
Opponent(s)01  23.11.2010   
Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse
D-89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Langöhrig, Angelika Beate, et al
Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
05.01.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.07.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.06.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition09.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1858/16
19.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:25.01.2005Request for further processing filed
25.01.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.03.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY24.02.2010
GR25.05.2010
LU07.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
[2015/21]
Former [2010/48]CY24.02.2010
GR25.05.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0538917  (KENDALL & CO) [X] 1-4,8,11-14 * column 7, line 19 - line 41 * * column 8, line 5 - line 9; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0099748  (SMITH & NEPHEW ASS) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 8, line 19 - page 9, line 4 * * page 11, line 1 - line 6 *;
 [DA]EP0304536  (GOODRICH CO B F) [DA] 1-14 * abstract *