Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318708

EP1318708 - Resin filler and multilayer printed wiring board [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.10.2005  [2005/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IBIDEN CO., LTD.
1, Kandamachi 2-chome
Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503 / JP
[2003/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Kawamura, Yoichiro
Ibiden Co., Ltd., 1-1, Kitakata, Ibigawa-cho
Ibigun Gifu 501-06 / JP
02 / Murase, Hideki
Ibiden Co., Ltd., 1-1, Kitakata, Ibigawa-cho
Ibigun Gifu 501-06 / JP
03 / Asai, Motoo
Ibiden Co., Ltd., 1-1, Kitakata, Ibigawa-cho
Ibigun Gifu 501-06 / JP
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03004268.323.10.1996
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateJP1995027392823.10.1995         Original published format: JP 27392895
JP1995031746910.11.1995         Original published format: JP 31746995
JP1996016340224.06.1996         Original published format: JP 16340296
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1318708
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1318708
Date:18.06.2003
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318708
Date:20.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:H05K3/46, H05K3/38
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   GB,   NL [2003/24]
TitleGerman:Harzfüllstoff und mehrschichtige Leiterplatte[2003/24]
English:Resin filler and multilayer printed wiring board[2003/24]
French:Résine de remplissage et panneau à circuit imprimé[2003/24]
Examination procedure26.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
20.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2004Fee for grant paid
18.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96935417.4  / EP0800336
Opposition(s)21.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH06302956  ;
 [A]JPH05198909  ;
 [A]JPH04217389  ;
 [A]JPH06275959
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931119), vol. 017, no. 629, Database accession no. (E - 1462), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921208), vol. 016, no. 567, Database accession no. (E - 1296), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941226), vol. 018, no. 687, Database accession no. (E - 1651), [A] 1 * abstract *