blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1342550

EP1342550 - Method and device for determining temperature profiles throughout the thickness of a polymer preform, method for manufacturing containers using a reheat stretch blow molding process and reheat stretch blow molding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/37]Method and device for predicting temperature profiles throughout the thickness of a polymer preform, and a preform and a container made according to them
[2006/03]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY
100 North Eastman Road
Kingsport TN 37660 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/37]For all designated states
EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY
100 North Eastman Road
Kingsport, TN 37660 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Shelby, Marcus David
299 Pactolus Road
Kingsport, TN 37663 / US
02 / Horton, Kevin Douglas
519 Central Street
Johson City, TN 37604 / US
03 / Hall, Harry Probert
2048 Malvern Drive
Kingsport, TN 37660 / US
 [2003/37]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/37]Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date03004302.027.02.2003
[2003/37]
Priority number, dateUS2002009024204.03.2002         Original published format: US 90242
[2003/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1342550
Date:10.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1342550
Date:14.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2003
ClassificationIPC:B29C49/64
[2003/37]
CPC:
B29C49/6454 (EP,US); B29C2035/0822 (EP,US); B29C2049/7861 (EP);
B29C2049/78805 (EP); B29C2949/0715 (EP); B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/68 (EP,US); B29C49/78 (EP,US); B29K2667/00 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0067 (EP,US); B29K2995/0083 (EP,US); B29L2031/7158 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/24]
Former [2003/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung des Temperaturprofils über die Dicke eines Kunststoff-Vorformlings, sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Behälters mittels Aufwärmen-Streckblasformverfahren und Aufwärmen-Streckblasform-Vorrichtung[2006/03]
English:Method and device for determining temperature profiles throughout the thickness of a polymer preform, method for manufacturing containers using a reheat stretch blow molding process and reheat stretch blow molding machine[2006/03]
French:Procédé et appareil pour déterminer le profil de température le long de l'épaisseur d'une préforme en plastique, procédé de fabrication de récipients suivant un procédé de moulage par réchauffage-étirage-soufflage et appareil de moulage par réchauffage-étirage-soufflage[2006/03]
Former [2003/37]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Voraussage des Temperaturprofils über die Dicke eines Kunststoff-Vorformlings, sowie entsprechend hergestellte Vorformling und Behälter
Former [2003/37]Method and device for predicting temperature profiles throughout the thickness of a polymer preform, and a preform and a container made according to them
Former [2003/37]Procédé et appareil pour la prédiction du profil de température le long de l'épaisseur d'une préforme en plastique, ainsi que la préforme et le récipient produits selon ce procédé et cet appareil
Examination procedure12.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/16]
10.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2006Fee for grant paid
23.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
CY14.06.2006
CZ14.06.2006
EE14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
SI14.06.2006
SK14.06.2006
TR14.06.2006
BG14.09.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
HU15.12.2006
IE27.02.2007
LU27.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/38]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
CY14.06.2006
CZ14.06.2006
EE14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
SI14.06.2006
SK14.06.2006
BG14.09.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
IE27.02.2007
LU27.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2008/38]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
CZ14.06.2006
EE14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
SI14.06.2006
SK14.06.2006
BG14.09.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
IE27.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2008/31]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
CZ14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
SI14.06.2006
SK14.06.2006
BG14.09.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
IE27.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2008/21]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
CZ14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
SI14.06.2006
SK14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
IE27.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2008/10]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
CZ14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
SI14.06.2006
SK14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
IE27.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2007/49]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
CZ14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
SI14.06.2006
SK14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
MC28.02.2007
Former [2007/39]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
CZ14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
SI14.06.2006
SK14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/22]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
CZ14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
SI14.06.2006
SK14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/19]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
CZ14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
SI14.06.2006
SK14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/13]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
CZ14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
SI14.06.2006
SK14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/12]AT14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
CZ14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
SI14.06.2006
SK14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/03]AT14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
SI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
Former [2006/52]AT14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
Former [2006/48]SE14.09.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]US4731513  (COLLETTE WAYNE N [US]) [X] 1-23 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - column 2, line 60 *;
 [X]US5256341  (DENIS GERARD [FR], et al) [X] 1-23 * column 5, line 60 - column 2, line 66; figure 2 *;
 [X]AT521U  (KOSME ETIKETTIERTECHNIK GES M [AT]) [X] 1-23 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0892331  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-23 * page 6, line 37 - page 6, line 47; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]  - YONG-YAO YANG ET AL, "DYNAMIC MODEL BASED OPTIMIZATION CONTROL FOR REHEATING FURNACES", COMPUTERS IN INDUSTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19880301), vol. 10, no. 1, ISSN 0166-3615, pages 11 - 20, XP000030129 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0166-3615(88)90044-9
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.