Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316651

EP1316651 - Load-carrying element with flexible outer skin and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/23]Load-carrying element with flexible outer skin
[2011/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.11.2012
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 02.07.2014  [2014/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kniese, Leif
Teutonen Str. 27
14129 Berlin / DE
[2003/23]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/03]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2003/23]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03005183.301.04.2000
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateDE199911641101.04.1999         Original published format: DE 19916411
[2003/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1316651
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1316651
Date:02.01.2004
[2004/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1316651
Date:18.01.2012
Language:DE
[2012/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:A47C7/02, A47C7/46, A47C31/12
[2004/01]
Former International [2003/23]E04B1/344, A47C7/46, A47C7/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/23]
TitleGerman:Bauteil zur Aufnahme von Kräften, mit einer flexiblen Aussenhaut und seine Verwendung[2011/19]
English:Load-carrying element with flexible outer skin and its use[2011/19]
French:Elément de support de charges avec enveloppe extérieure souple et son usage[2011/25]
Former [2003/23]Bauteil zur Aufnahme von Kräften, mit einer flexiblen Aussenhaut
Former [2003/23]Load-carrying element with flexible outer skin
Former [2003/23]Elément de support de charges avec enveloppe extérieure souple
Examination procedure02.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/36]
19.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2011Fee for grant paid
21.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00250109.6  / EP1040999
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000250109) is  28.04.2003
Opposition(s)19.10.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
28.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
29.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
29.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
28.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200708   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
IE18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
AT01.04.2012
LU01.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
ES29.04.2012
BE30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
PT18.05.2012
[2014/27]
Former [2013/36]CY18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
IE18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
AT01.04.2012
GR19.04.2012
ES29.04.2012
BE30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2013/22]CY18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
IE18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
GR19.04.2012
ES29.04.2012
BE30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2013/08]CY18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
IE18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
GR19.04.2012
BE30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/50]CY18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
IE18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
GR19.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/49]CY18.01.2012
DK18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
IE18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
GR19.04.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/48]CY18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
IE18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
SE18.01.2012
GR19.04.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/47]CY18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
IE18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
GR19.04.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/41]CY18.01.2012
FI18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
GR19.04.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/37]FI18.01.2012
NL18.01.2012
GR19.04.2012
PT18.05.2012
Former [2012/36]NL18.01.2012
GR19.04.2012
Former [2012/35]NL18.01.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9908570  (SCHUSTER WILHELM [AT]) [A] 1,2,4,5,8-10,12,13 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 2 - page 15, paragraph L * * figures 3,6-8,12-18 *;
 [A]DE4432656  (BRESCH GOTTHARD [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4121768  (GRAMMER AG) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *;
 [DA]EP0860355  (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [DA] 1-5 * abstract * * column 2, line 34 - line 46 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 21 * * column 4, line 10 - line 33 * * column 5, line 58 - column 7, line 11 * * column 8, line 48 - column 10, line 53 * * figures 1,4,10,14,15 *;
 [A]FR2715124  (BALLU ARNAUD [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,11 * page 6, line 2 - page 9, line 19 * * figures 2,3,7 *;
 [A]LU88528  (THIRKELL LAURENT [LU]) [A] 1,2,4 * page 3 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-3,8 *;
 [A]AU6563380  (MCKINLAY I B) [A] 1,2,4 * page 6, line 6 - page 8, line 21 * * figures 1,3,4 *;
 [A]  BEITZ W, KÜTTNER K-H, Dubbel: Taschenbuch für den Maschinenbau (17. Auflage), BERLIN, DE, SPRINGER-VERLAG, XP002203654 [A] 1-16 * page C8, column 2, paragraph 2.4.1 - page C11, column 2, paragraph 2.4.2; table 1 *
ExaminationFR2266805
by applicantAU6563380
 LU88528
 EP0453713
 DE4411610
 WO9908570