blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1346785

EP1346785 - Reduction casting method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.08.2008
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Refusal of applicationpublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSIN KOGYO CO., LTD.
840, Ohaza Kokubu Ueda-shi
Nagano-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/39]For all designated states
NISSIN KOGYO CO., LTD.
No. 840, Ohaza Kokubu
Ueda-shi, Nagano-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ban, Keisuke
Nissin Kogyo Co., Ltd., 840, Ohaza Kokubu
Ueda-shi, Nagano-ken / JP
 [2003/39]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/39]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date03005402.713.03.2003
[2003/39]
Priority number, dateJP2002006821113.03.2002         Original published format: JP 2002068211
[2003/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1346785
Date:24.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1346785
Date:30.06.2004
[2004/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2004
ClassificationIPC:B22D15/00, B22D17/00, B22D21/00, B22D27/00, B22D27/09
[2003/39]
CPC:
B22D21/00 (EP,US); B22D15/00 (EP,US); B22D17/00 (EP,US);
B22D21/007 (EP,US); B22D27/00 (EP,US); B22D27/09 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI [2005/12]
Former [2003/39]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum reduzierenden Giessen[2003/39]
English:Reduction casting method[2003/39]
French:Méthode pour la réduction pendant la coulée[2003/39]
Examination procedure09.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/46]
08.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2005Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/36]
19.12.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.04.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/36]
Appeal following examination25.01.2006Appeal received No.  T0707/06
21.04.2006Statement of grounds filed
03.04.2008Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
03.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
08.04.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2000280063  ;
 [A]EP1145787  (NISSIN KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1153678  (NISSIN KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0058]; figures 1-4; claims 1-3 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000280063 A 20001010 (NISSIN KOGYO CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.