Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1411413

EP1411413 - Attachable/detachable keyboard apparatus of portable computer system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yoido-dong
Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul / KR
[2017/10]
Former [2004/17]For all designated states
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-Gu
Seoul / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Yang, Myeong Kyoo
Byeokjeokgol Lotte Apt.
946-309, Yeongtong-dong
Paldal-gu, Suweon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Park, Joung Sea
19-94, Nogosan-dong
Mapo-gu, Seoul / KR
03 / Choi, Dong Joon
Hanra Apt. 305-1303
Cheongsol maeul
Geumgok-dong
Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2017/10]
Former [2004/17]01 / Yang, Myeong Kyoo
Byeokjeokgol Lotte Apt., 946-309, Yeongtong-dong
Paldal-gu, Suweon-si, Gyeongi-do / KR
02 / Park, Joung Sea
19-94, Nogosan-dong
Mapo-gu, Seoul / KR
03 / Choi, Dong Joon
Hanra Apt. 305-1303, Cheongsol maeul, Geumgok-dong
Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2017/10]
Former [2004/17]Viktor, Rainer
Vossius & Partner POB 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date03006225.120.03.2003
[2004/17]
Priority number, dateKR2002005160929.08.2002         Original published format: KR 2002051609
[2004/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1411413
Date:21.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1411413
Date:26.05.2010
[2010/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1411413
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16
[2004/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/10]
Former [2011/05]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Former [2004/17]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anbring- und abnehmbare Tastatur für einen tragbaren Rechner[2004/17]
English:Attachable/detachable keyboard apparatus of portable computer system[2004/17]
French:Clavier à monter/démonter pour un ordinateur portable[2004/17]
Examination procedure20.03.2003Examination requested  [2004/17]
26.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.01.2017Fee for grant paid
09.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.01.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
31.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.12.2010
Opposition(s)11.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.03.2003
AT08.03.2017
CY08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
IE20.03.2017
LU20.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
PT10.07.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU20.03.2003
AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
IE20.03.2017
LU20.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/24]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
IE20.03.2017
LU20.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/13]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
IE20.03.2017
LU20.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/10]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
LU20.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/06]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Former [2017/42]ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[IY]DE20012863U  (DOSCH & AMAND GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1-3,5 * Web-pad with keyboard docking station; page 1, line 5 - page 8, line 10; figures 1-2 * [Y] 4,6-19;
 [Y]US2002109962  (TSENG PETER [TW], et al) [Y] 4,6-19 * Hinge allowing rotation and tilting of the screen.; paragraphs [0023] - [0036]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US5949408  (KANG BENG HONG [SG], et al) [A] 1-19 * sensor for disabling keyboard; line 13 - column 9, line 59 *;
 [A]US5583529  (SATOU YOUJI [JP]) [A] 1-19 * detachable display; column 3, line 5 - column 5, line 46; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US5335142  (ANDERSON WILLIAM J [US]) [A] 1-19 * hinge allowing rotation and tilting of the screen; column 3, line 4 - column 6, line 55; figures 1-9 *
ExaminationGB2318195
by applicantDE20012863U
 US2002109962