Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1341337 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1341337



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1040
28.11.2012 Closing of application Search / examination 2
17.11.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.11.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.11.2012 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 23
15.11.2012 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
09.08.2012 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.08.2012 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
02.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
02.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
02.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
02.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 16
02.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
02.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
02.07.2012 Claims Appeal 4
02.07.2012 Claims Appeal 4
02.07.2012 Claims Appeal 4
02.07.2012 Claims Appeal 16
02.07.2012 Claims Appeal 4
02.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.07.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
02.07.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
02.07.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 24
02.07.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
02.07.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
02.07.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.07.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 116
02.07.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
02.07.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
02.07.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
02.07.2012 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 38
02.07.2012 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 25
02.07.2012 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 37
11.05.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.05.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.05.2012 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
08.05.2012 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 12
03.05.2012 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.02.2012 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
07.07.2010 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
05.07.2010 Submission concerning representation Appeal 2
15.03.2010 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
05.03.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
01.03.2010 Claims Appeal 4
01.03.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
26.02.2010 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Appeal 28
04.08.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Appeal 1
13.02.2009 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
06.02.2009 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 7
04.02.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
13.01.2009 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
18.12.2008 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.11.2008 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
13.11.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.11.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.11.2008 Annex to the communication Appeal 2
11.11.2008 Decision refusing a request for correction of errors Appeal 2
04.11.2008 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
15.09.2008 Claims Appeal 4
15.09.2008 Claims Appeal 4
15.09.2008 Claims Appeal 4
15.09.2008 Description Appeal 2
15.09.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 26
15.09.2008 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
21.07.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
17.06.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
17.06.2008 Communication refusing a request for correction of a decision Search / examination 1
03.06.2008 Request for correction Search / examination 4
27.05.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
26.05.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
23.05.2008 Annex Search / examination 16
23.05.2008 Annex Search / examination 9
23.05.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
23.05.2008 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
23.05.2008 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
23.05.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 14
23.05.2008 Means of redress Search / examination 2
23.05.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
23.05.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
23.05.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
23.05.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.03.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
13.03.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 10
16.11.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
15.11.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
13.11.2007 Annex Search / examination 8
13.11.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
13.11.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.11.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
28.09.2007 General enquiry Search / examination 1
28.08.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
28.08.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
19.04.2006 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
19.04.2006 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
12.10.2005 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 3
07.10.2005 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.08.2005 General enquiry Search / examination 1
24.01.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
24.01.2005 Claims Search / examination 7
24.01.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
22.11.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.11.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.07.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
12.07.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.02.2004 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
19.02.2004 Claims Search / examination 6
12.01.2004 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
15.12.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
29.10.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 2
29.10.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.10.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
23.07.2003 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.07.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.06.2003 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
06.06.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.06.2003 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2003 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.04.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.04.2003 Claims Search / examination 5
04.04.2003 Description Search / examination 61
04.04.2003 Drawings Search / examination 10
04.04.2003 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 8
04.04.2003 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7
14.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 66
14.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 66
14.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 52
14.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 66