blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1341338 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1341338



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 792
20.08.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
13.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.08.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.04.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
30.04.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.12.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
24.10.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
18.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.10.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.06.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
19.06.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
03.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
03.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.11.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
23.06.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.06.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.05.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
13.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.04.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 22
06.04.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 22
06.04.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.02.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.02.2017 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 4
30.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
30.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.12.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.12.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.12.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.12.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.12.2016 Claims Appeal 3
30.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.12.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
21.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.11.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
11.11.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 10
08.11.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
20.07.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
13.07.2016 General enquiry Appeal 1
16.12.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
16.09.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.08.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
31.07.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
30.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
30.07.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.07.2014 Claims Appeal 2
30.07.2014 Description Appeal 16
30.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.07.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
28.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
28.05.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
11.04.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
26.03.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.03.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
20.03.2014 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
20.03.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
20.03.2014 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
20.03.2014 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
20.03.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 17
20.03.2014 Means of redress Search / examination 2
20.03.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
20.03.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
20.03.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
20.03.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
31.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.01.2014 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 2
31.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
23.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.01.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 8
23.01.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
23.01.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
23.01.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.01.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.01.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
17.01.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
17.01.2014 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
17.01.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
16.01.2014 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 6
16.01.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
16.01.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
09.01.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
09.01.2014 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
09.01.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
03.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.01.2014 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 4
03.01.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.01.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
31.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.12.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
31.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
31.12.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
30.12.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.10.2013 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
04.10.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.10.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
02.10.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.09.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.08.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
28.12.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
28.12.2012 Claims Search / examination 6
28.12.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
20.09.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
20.09.2012 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
20.09.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
02.08.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.07.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.03.2012 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
22.03.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
22.03.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.03.2012 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.03.2012 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
13.09.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
13.09.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
13.09.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
05.07.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
19.03.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
02.03.2010 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
26.02.2010 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 28
04.08.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
13.02.2009 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
06.02.2009 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 7
04.02.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.01.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.11.2007 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.09.2007 General enquiry Search / examination 1
21.08.2006 Adjournment of examination/opposition proceedings Search / examination 1
02.08.2006 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.07.2006 General enquiry Search / examination 1
12.10.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
24.01.2005 Claims Search / examination 7
24.01.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
19.11.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.11.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.07.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.07.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.02.2004 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
19.02.2004 Claims Search / examination 12
08.01.2004 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
10.11.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
10.11.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.11.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
23.07.2003 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
13.06.2003 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
12.06.2003 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
06.06.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.06.2003 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2003 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.04.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.04.2003 Claims Search / examination 6
04.04.2003 Description Search / examination 61
04.04.2003 Drawings Search / examination 10
04.04.2003 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 8
04.04.2003 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7
14.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 66
14.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 66
14.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 52
14.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 66