Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1350904

EP1350904 - Floor planks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  21.09.2012
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, FR, HU, LU, TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
tilo GmbH
Magetsham 19
4923 Lohnsburg / AT
[2012/43]
Former [2003/41]For all designated states
tilo GmbH
Magetsham 19
4923 Lohnsburg / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Kiefel, Heinz
Am Eichenhain 6
94535 Eging / DE
02 / Schrattenecker, Franz
Magetsham 21
4923 Lohnsburg / AT
 [2003/41]
Representative(s)Ofner, Clemens
Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16
4580 Windischgarsten / AT
[2012/02]
Former [2010/26]Brandt, Detlef
Meisenstrasse 96
33607 Bielefeld / DE
Former [2003/41]Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff
Flasskuhle 6
58452 Witten / DE
Application number, filing date03008103.807.04.2003
[2003/41]
Priority number, dateDE200211513905.04.2002         Original published format: DE 10215139
[2003/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1350904
Date:08.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1350904
Date:17.12.2003
[2003/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1350904
Date:17.06.2009
Language:DE
[2009/25]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1350904
Date:24.10.2012
Language:DE
[2012/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:E04F15/02, E04F15/04
[2003/51]
Former International [2003/41]E04F15/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/41]
Extension statesLT16.06.2004
LV16.06.2004
TitleGerman:Fussbodendielen[2003/41]
English:Floor planks[2003/41]
French:Planches de plancher[2003/41]
Examination procedure16.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/34]
10.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2009Fee for grant paid
30.03.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.03.2010  18.03.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Flooring Technologies Ltd.
Portico Building Marina Street
Pieta PTA 9044 / MT
Opponent's representative
Rehmann, Thorsten, et al
Gramm, Lins & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/16]
Opponent(s)01  11.03.2010  18.03.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Flooring Technologies Ltd.
Portico Building Marina Street
Pieta PTA 9044 / MT
Opponent's representative
Rehmann, Thorsten, et al
Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
20.04.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.10.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.11.2010Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
14.01.2011Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
07.12.2011Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.12.2011Date of oral proceedings
29.02.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.02.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.06.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
14.09.2012Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
19.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY17.06.2009
DK17.06.2009
EE17.06.2009
IE17.06.2009
NL17.06.2009
RO17.06.2009
SI17.06.2009
SK17.06.2009
TR17.06.2009
BG17.09.2009
SE17.09.2009
GR18.09.2009
PT17.10.2009
HU18.12.2009
GB07.04.2010
LU07.04.2010
BE30.04.2010
FR30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2011/41]DK17.06.2009
EE17.06.2009
IE17.06.2009
NL17.06.2009
RO17.06.2009
SI17.06.2009
SK17.06.2009
BG17.09.2009
SE17.09.2009
GR18.09.2009
PT17.10.2009
GB07.04.2010
BE30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2011/16]DK17.06.2009
EE17.06.2009
FI17.06.2009
IE17.06.2009
NL17.06.2009
RO17.06.2009
SI17.06.2009
SK17.06.2009
BG17.09.2009
SE17.09.2009
GR18.09.2009
PT17.10.2009
GB07.04.2010
BE30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2010/50]DK17.06.2009
EE17.06.2009
FI17.06.2009
IE17.06.2009
NL17.06.2009
RO17.06.2009
SI17.06.2009
SK17.06.2009
BG17.09.2009
SE17.09.2009
GR18.09.2009
PT17.10.2009
MC30.04.2010
Former [2010/48]DK17.06.2009
EE17.06.2009
FI17.06.2009
IE17.06.2009
NL17.06.2009
RO17.06.2009
SI17.06.2009
SK17.06.2009
BG17.09.2009
SE17.09.2009
GR18.09.2009
PT17.10.2009
Former [2010/20]DK17.06.2009
EE17.06.2009
FI17.06.2009
IE17.06.2009
NL17.06.2009
RO17.06.2009
SI17.06.2009
SK17.06.2009
BG17.09.2009
SE17.09.2009
PT17.10.2009
Former [2010/18]EE17.06.2009
FI17.06.2009
IE17.06.2009
NL17.06.2009
RO17.06.2009
SI17.06.2009
SK17.06.2009
BG17.09.2009
SE17.09.2009
PT17.10.2009
Former [2010/16]EE17.06.2009
FI17.06.2009
IE17.06.2009
NL17.06.2009
RO17.06.2009
SI17.06.2009
SK17.06.2009
SE17.09.2009
PT17.10.2009
Former [2010/10]EE17.06.2009
FI17.06.2009
IE17.06.2009
NL17.06.2009
RO17.06.2009
SI17.06.2009
SK17.06.2009
SE17.09.2009
Former [2010/09]EE17.06.2009
FI17.06.2009
IE17.06.2009
RO17.06.2009
SI17.06.2009
SE17.09.2009
Former [2010/07]FI17.06.2009
IE17.06.2009
SI17.06.2009
SE17.09.2009
Former [2009/51]FI17.06.2009
SI17.06.2009
SE17.09.2009
Former [2009/49]FI17.06.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0198604  (TARKETT SOMMER AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 5, line 4 - page 10, line 18; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]DE20008708U  (KRONOSPAN TECH CO LTD [CY]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * page 10, line 7 - page 15, line 3; figures 1-4 *;
 [PX]DE20112474U  (KAINDL WALS M [AT]) [PX] 1-8 * page 2, line 12 - page 4, line 28; figures 1-3 *
ExaminationDE10001076
 WO0047841
 EP1279778
 WO03016654
 WO2004003314
 BE557844
by applicantWO0047841
 WO0198604
 DE20008708U
 WO03016654
OppositionWO0188307
 DE20203311U