Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1475610

EP1475610 - Remote vehicle control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.12.2009
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH
Becker-Göring-Strasse 16
76307 Karlsbad / DE
[2009/06]
Former [2004/46]For all designated states
Harman/Becker Automotive Systems GmbH
Becker-Göring-Strasse 16
76307 Karlsbad / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Behrens, Ralph
Neue Strasse 14
31174 Schellerten / DE
02 / Wietzke, Joachim
Schilling-v. Canstatt Strasse 10
76228 Karlsruhe / DE
 [2004/46]
Representative(s)Bertsch, Florian Oliver
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/26]Bertsch, Florian Oliver, Dr.
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2004/46]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03009754.706.05.2003
[2004/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1475610
Date:10.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1475610
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/34, G01C21/36, B60R25/04, B60R16/02, H04L29/06, H04L29/08
[2004/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/46]
TitleGerman:Fernsteuerung für Fahrzeug[2004/46]
English:Remote vehicle control[2004/46]
French:Commande à distance pour véhicule[2007/43]
Former [2004/46]Commande à distance pour vehicule
Examination procedure02.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/26]
15.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
11.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
16.04.2008Fee for grant paid
16.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/02]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
16.04.2008Request for further processing filed
16.04.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200604   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2006
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.02.2009
BE04.02.2009
CY04.02.2009
CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
TR04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
IE06.05.2009
LU06.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT06.07.2009
HU05.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/31]AT04.02.2009
BE04.02.2009
CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
IE06.05.2009
LU06.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT06.07.2009
HU05.08.2009
Former [2011/21]AT04.02.2009
BE04.02.2009
CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
IE06.05.2009
LU06.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2010/48]AT04.02.2009
BE04.02.2009
CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
IE06.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2010/21]AT04.02.2009
BE04.02.2009
CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
IE06.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2010/08]AT04.02.2009
BE04.02.2009
CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2010/04]AT04.02.2009
BE04.02.2009
CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2009/50]AT04.02.2009
BE04.02.2009
CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2009/49]AT04.02.2009
BE04.02.2009
CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2009/46]AT04.02.2009
BE04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
Former [2009/43]AT04.02.2009
BE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
Former [2009/40]AT04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
Former [2009/38]FI04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
Former [2009/36]FI04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
ES15.05.2009
Former [2009/34]NL04.02.2009
ES15.05.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003023371  (STEPHENS SPENCER [US]) [X] 1-8,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1063494  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,12 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0074019  (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE CORP LP [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2001025222  (BECHTOLSHEIM STEPHAN V [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0237446  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,12 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2002013660  (FLICK KENNETH E [US]) [X] 1,13,14,16 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6330499  (CHOU PAUL BAO-LUO [US], et al) [X] 1,4,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2002164973  (JANIK CRAIG M [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
 [X]  - KENNEDY P, MobileWebchanging the face of mobile networking through universal wireless connectivity, NORTHCON/96 SEATTLE, WA, USA 4-6 NOV. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, PAGE(S) 89-94, ISBN 0-7803-3277-6, XP010203044 [X] 1,7-11,16-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NORTHC.1996.564745