Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1429241

EP1429241 - Method and apparatus for porting software programs to a target platform with the help of an electronic data processing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  11.06.2010
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2010Refusal of applicationpublished on 14.07.2010  [2010/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/25]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Humpert, Hans-Dieter
Bärenloh 3
91334 Hemhofen / DE
02 / Kleyer, Dieter
Am Hasengarten 6
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
 [2004/25]
Representative(s)Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte
Eschersheimer Landstrasse 105-107
60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2006/23]
Application number, filing date03011452.420.05.2003
[2004/25]
Priority number, dateEP2002002743209.12.2002         Original published format: EP 02027432
[2004/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1429241
Date:16.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44
[2004/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/25]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Portierung von Softwareprogrammen auf eine Zielplattform mittels einer EDV-Anlage[2004/25]
English:Method and apparatus for porting software programs to a target platform with the help of an electronic data processing device[2004/25]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour transformer des programmes logiciels vers une plate-forme cible à l'aide d'un système de traitement de données électronique[2004/25]
Examination procedure06.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/37]
18.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2006Date of oral proceedings
16.06.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.09.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/28]
27.01.2010Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/28]
Appeal following examination06.11.2006Appeal received No.  T0354/07
04.12.2006Statement of grounds filed
27.01.2010Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
27.01.2010Date of oral proceedings
01.02.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
22.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
18.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
21.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]US5142469  (WEISENBORN GERALD M) [A] 3,5 * figure 2 *;
 [X]  - "THE REALIZER - A CASE TOOL FOR REAL-WORLD APPLICATIONS", ELEKTOR ELECTRONICS, ELEKTOR PUBLISHERS LTD. CANTERBURY, GB, (19920201), vol. 18, no. 197, ISSN 0268-4519, page 43, XP000290169 [X] 1-6 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HALANG W A, "LANGUAGES AND TOOLS FOR THE GRAPHICAL AND TEXTUAL SYSTEM INDEPENDENT PROGRAMMING OF PROGRAMMABLE LOGIC CONTROLLERS", MICROPROCESSING AND MICROPROGRAMMING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19890801), vol. 27, no. 1/5, ISSN 0165-6074, pages 583 - 590, XP000071818 [A] 6 * abstract * * page 583, column 1, paragraphs 3,4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-6074(89)90115-4
 [PA]  - "Realizer User's Guide", ACTUM SOLUTIONS, (20030422), URL: http://www.actum.com/download/userguide.pdf, (20040325), XP002275438 [PA] 1-6 * Kapitel 2, 5, 6, 9 *