Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1429241 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1429241



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 214
30.06.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
10.06.2010 Closing of application Search / examination 2
14.05.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.05.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.04.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 14
01.02.2010 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
27.01.2010 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 12
21.11.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.11.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.11.2009 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
10.11.2009 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.10.2009 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
12.10.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
09.10.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 12
11.08.2009 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 5
08.08.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
07.03.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
22.02.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
04.12.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
07.11.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.11.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
21.09.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.09.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.09.2006 Annex Search / examination 1
07.09.2006 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
07.09.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
07.09.2006 Means of redress Search / examination 1
26.07.2006 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
16.06.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
16.06.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
16.06.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
16.06.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.06.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.06.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.06.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.05.2006 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
03.05.2006 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
02.05.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.04.2006 Annex Search / examination 2
19.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
19.04.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
13.04.2006 Annex Search / examination 2
13.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
13.04.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
14.03.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
14.03.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.03.2006 Annex Search / examination 1
06.03.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.03.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.06.2005 Annex Search / examination 2
10.06.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
10.06.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
18.02.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
18.02.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.06.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
06.05.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
21.04.2004 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
21.04.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.04.2004 European search report Search / examination 1
20.05.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.05.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
20.05.2003 Description Search / examination 9
20.05.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.05.2003 Drawings Search / examination 1
20.05.2003 Priority document Search / examination 14
20.05.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6