EP1380597 - Latexes for paper coatings based on halogen and sulphur free molecular weight regulators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Opposition rejected | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PolymerLatex GmbH Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2005/52] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Polymer Latex GmbH & Co. KG Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1 45772 Marl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulze, Uwe, Dr. Bommerhöfer Weg 56 40670 Meerbusch / DE | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Polypatent, Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 03011870.7 | 27.05.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | DE2002130793 | 08.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10230793 | [2004/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1380597 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1380597 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/38, C08F212/00 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
C08F2/38 (EP,KR,US);
D21H19/58 (EP,US);
D21H27/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/03] | Title | German: | Latices für Papierbeschichtungen auf der Basis halogen- und schwefelfreier Molekulargewichtsregler | [2004/03] | English: | Latexes for paper coatings based on halogen and sulphur free molecular weight regulators | [2004/03] | French: | Latex pour le couchage du papier à base de régulateurs du poids moléculaire exempts de halogène et soufre | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 19.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.11.2006
28.11.2006
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.11.2006
28.11.2006
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2006/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.11.2006
BASF Aktiengesellschaft Global Intellectual Property Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 29.12.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.03.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.10.2008 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2009/13] | 08.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.11.2008 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.02.2006 | CZ | 22.02.2006 | EE | 22.02.2006 | IE | 22.02.2006 | RO | 22.02.2006 | SI | 22.02.2006 | SK | 22.02.2006 | TR | 22.02.2006 | BG | 22.05.2006 | DK | 22.05.2006 | GR | 23.05.2006 | LU | 27.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | ES | 02.06.2006 | PT | 24.07.2006 | HU | 23.08.2006 | CH | 31.05.2007 | LI | 31.05.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 22.02.2006 | |
EE | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
TR | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
LU | 27.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
HU | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 22.02.2006 | |
EE | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
HU | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 22.02.2006 | |
EE | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 22.02.2006 | |
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | IE | 22.02.2006 | |
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | IE | 22.02.2006 | |
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | IE | 22.02.2006 | |
IT | 22.02.2006 | ||
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | IE | 22.02.2006 | |
IT | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | IE | 22.02.2006 | |
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | IE | 22.02.2006 | |
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | IE | 22.02.2006 | |
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | IE | 22.02.2006 | |
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | IE | 22.02.2006 | |
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | SI | 22.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3595823 (HUANG DENIS K) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US3766151 (HUANG D) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9502087 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9530697 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9630415 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US5612430 (NIJHUIS WALTER H N [NL], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5708104 (VERTOMMEN LUC LOUIS THEOPHILE [NL], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |