Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1374959

EP1374959 - Discovery and distribution of game session information [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.01.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 01.03.2017  [2017/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/17]
Former [2004/01]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Multerer, Boyd C.
115 34th Avenue S.
Seattle WA 98112 / US
02 / Anderson, Darren L.
4225 155th Place SE
Bellevue, Washington 98006 / US
03 / VanAntwerp, Mark D.
1010 276th Ave NE
Redmond, Washington 98053 / US
04 / Morais, Dinarte R.
4950 166th Ct. NE
Redmond, Washington 98052 / US
05 / Newson, Paul E.
728 3rd St. W.
Kirkland, Washington 98033 / US
06 / Koikawa, Mitsuo
1-11-13-503, Azabujuban
Minato-ku, Japan 13 (106-0045) / JP
 [2004/01]
Representative(s)Fischer, Michael Maria , et al
Olswang Germany LLP
Rosental 4
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/49]Fischer, Michael Maria , et al
Olswang Gemany LLP
Maximilianstraße 13
80539 München / DE
Former [2004/01]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03012059.628.05.2003
[2004/01]
Priority number, dateUS2002018422528.06.2002         Original published format: US 184225
[2004/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1374959
Date:02.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1374959
Date:04.08.2004
[2004/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2004
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/12
[2004/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/01]
TitleGerman:Erkennung und Verteilung von Spielsitzungsinformationen[2004/01]
English:Discovery and distribution of game session information[2004/01]
French:Découverte et distribution d'informations sur des sessions de jeu[2004/01]
Examination procedure11.01.2005Examination requested  [2005/11]
05.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.09.2016
22.09.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
10.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/09]
20.10.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/09]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
07.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
07.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9710561  (MICRO FORTE PTY LIMITED ; LEWIS STEPHEN (AU); MARGHERITI JOHN DE (AU)) [X] 1-6,9,21,22,25,29,33,36,40,44,45 * page 11 * * page 16, line 4 - line 16 * * figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0714684  (NET GAME LTD) [A] 1-48 * page 4, line 14 - line 15 * * page 5, line 15 - line 20 * * page 7, line 28 - line 32 * * page 8, line 41 - line 43 * * page 16, line 21 - line 41 * * page 17, line 24 - line 45 * * figure 1 * * figure 16 *;
 [A]  - OKAZAKI N, "Realization method of flexible private network system", INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (200009), Database accession no. 6726955, XP002279234 [A] 1-48 * column A *