Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1376392

EP1376392 - Method and system for associating actions with semantic labels in electronic documents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.04.2011
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.05.2011  [2011/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2004/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Reynar, Jeffrey C.
23322 NE 138th Way
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
02 / Sawicki, Marcin
13110 102nd Lane, Unit 6
Kirkland, WA 98034 / US
03 / Jones, Brian M.
10630 181st Ave., NE
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
04 / Little, Robert A.
21007 NE 117th Street
Redmond, WA 98053 / US
05 / Pratley, Christopher H.
443 Halladay Street
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
06 / Broman, Paul
14150 NE 20th Street 306
Bellevue, Washington 98007 / US
 [2007/32]
Former [2004/48]01 / Reynar, Jeffrey C.
23322 NE 138th Way
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
02 / Sawicki, Marcin
13110 102nd Lane, Unit 6
Kirkland, WA 98034 / US
03 / Jones, Brian M.
10630 181st Ave., NE
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
04 / Little, Robert A.
21007 NE 117th Street
Redmond, WA 98053 / US
05 / Pratley, Christopher H.
443 Halladay Street
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
06 / Broman, Paul
14150 NE 20th Street #306
Bellevue, Washington 98007 / US
Former [2004/38]01 / Reynar, Jeffrey C.
23322 NE 138th Way
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
02 / Sawicki, Marcin
13110 102nd Lane, Unit 6
Kirkland, WA 98034 / US
03 / Jones, Brian M.
10630 181st Ave., NE
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
04 / Little, Robert A.
21007 NE 117th Street
Redmond, WA 98053 / US
05 / Pratley, Christopher H.
443 Halladay Street
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
06 / Broman, Paul
14150 Ne 20th Street 306
Bellevue, Washington 98007 / US
Former [2004/01]01 / Reynar, Jeffrey C.
23322 NE 138th Way
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
02 / Sawicki, Marcin
13110 102nd Lane, Unit 6
Kirkland, WA 98034 / US
03 / Jones, Brian M.
10630 181st Ave., NE
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
04 / Little, Robert A.
21007 NE 117th Street
Redmond, WA 98053 / US
05 / Pratley, Christopher H.
443 Halladay Street
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
06 / Broman, Paul
975 Aberdeen Avenue, N.E. Apt. 407-E
Renton, WA 98056 / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/01]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03012432.530.05.2003
[2004/01]
Priority number, dateUS2002018429827.06.2002         Original published format: US 184298
[2004/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1376392
Date:02.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1376392
Date:22.06.2005
[2005/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/24, G06F17/27
[2004/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System um in elektronischen Dokumenten Aktionen mit semantischen Kennzeichnungen zu verbinden[2004/01]
English:Method and system for associating actions with semantic labels in electronic documents[2004/01]
French:Procédé et système d'association des actions avec des étiquettes semantiques dans des documents électroniques[2004/01]
Examination procedure27.10.2005Examination requested  [2005/52]
12.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/21]
07.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/21]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.01.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201008   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002007309  (REYNAR JEFF [US]) [X] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2002029304  (REYNAR JEFF [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0118687  (HEDLOEY ATLE [NO]) [X] 5-9 * page 1 - page 7; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "Smart Tags: Dumb Technology?", WEBREFERENCE.COM, (20010829), URL: http://www.webreference.com/xml/column38/3.html, (20050420), XP002325482 [A] 1-27 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "Being "Smart" with Smart Tags in Office XP", CREATE FOR MISSISSIPPI, (200108), URL: http://www.create.cett.msstate.edu/create/howto/smart_tags.pdf, (20050422), XP002325732 [A] 1-27 * the whole document *