EP1380253 - Optical system for measuring metabolism in a body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | For all designated states HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION 1-14, Uchikanda-1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0047 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | ||
For all designated states HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION 1-14, Uchikanda-1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0047 / JP | |||
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | ||
For all designated states Hitachi Medical Corporation 1-14, Uchikanda-1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0047 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Hiroki Hitachi Ltd., 5-1, Marunouchi, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Maki, Atsushi Hitachi Ltd., 5-1, Marunouchi, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Kiguchi, Masashi Hitachi Ltd., 5-1, Marunouchi, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2004/03] | Application number, filing date | 03012619.7 | 03.06.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | JP20020198282 | 08.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002198282 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1380253 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1380253 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
A61B5/14553 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0233 (EP,US);
A61B2562/046 (EP,US);
A61B5/0042 (EP,US);
A61B5/7264 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/41] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optisches System zur Vermessung des Stoffwechsels des Körpers | [2004/03] | English: | Optical system for measuring metabolism in a body | [2004/03] | French: | Système optique de mesure du métabolisme dans le corps | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 27.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.02.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.06.2009 | [2010/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5586554 (MAKI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 4, line 43 - column 7, line 14; figure 1; claims 1,5,15 *; | [Y]US5596987 (CHANCE BRITTON [US]) [Y] 10* abstract *; | [XY]EP0762109 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1-9 * column 6, line 8 - column 9, line 7; claims 1,2,8,9 * [Y] 10 |