blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1369621

EP1369621 - Fluid chain-tightener [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.11.2007
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
REGINA S.I.C.C. S.P.A.
Piazza Santa Maria Beltrade 1
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2005/14]For all designated states
REGINA S.I.C.C. S.p.A.
Piazza Santa Maria Beltrade 1
20123 Milano / IT
Former [2003/50]For all designated states
REGINA INDUSTRIA S.p.A.
Corso Magenta 46
20123 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Garbagnati, Carlo
Via Regina Teodolinda 1
23884 Castello Brianza (LC) / IT
02 / Coscia, Gianfranco
Viale Cornaggia 15
23807 Merate (LC) / IT
 [2003/50]
Representative(s)Faraggiana, Vittorio
Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l.
Via Vincenzo Monti 8
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2003/50]Faraggiana, Vittorio, Dr. Ing.
Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date03012679.104.06.2003
[2003/50]
Priority number, dateIT2002MI0124307.06.2002         Original published format: IT MI20021243
[2003/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1369621
Date:10.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1369621
Date:10.05.2006
[2006/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2006
ClassificationIPC:F16H7/08
[2003/50]
CPC:
F16H7/0836 (EP,US); F16H2007/0806 (EP,US); F16H2007/0812 (EP,US);
F16H2007/0872 (EP,US); F16H2007/0874 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/50]
TitleGerman:Hydraulischer Kettenspanner[2003/50]
English:Fluid chain-tightener[2003/50]
French:Tendeur de chaîne hydraulique[2003/50]
Examination procedure18.10.2006Examination requested  [2006/48]
20.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2007Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
15.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS59208250  ;
 [X]GB861741  (PERRY CHAIN COMPANY LTD) [X] 1,2,16 * figure - *;
 [Y]US3463022  (MILLER LAWRENCE J) [Y] 3-5 * figure 1 *;
 [X]US3964331  (OLDFIELD BENJAMIN DUNCAN) [X] 1,2,10,16 * figure - *;
 [A]US4283182  (KRAFT DERALD H) [A] 3-5* figure - *;
 [Y]US4553509  (MEZGER HANS [DE], et al) [Y] 13-15 * figure - *;
 [XY]DE4337827  (HYDRAULIK RING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,10-12,16 * figure 6 * [Y] 3-9,13-15;
 [X]US6129644  (INOUE KOZO [JP]) [X] 1,10 * figure - *;
 [Y]US2001007841  (NAKAKUBO KATSUYA [JP]) [Y] 3,6-9 * figure 5 *;
 [X]DE20102748U  (WINKLHOFER & SOEHNE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,10,16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850406), vol. 009, no. 077, Database accession no. (M - 369), & JP59208250 A 19841126 (HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KK) [A] 13-15 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.