Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1487186

EP1487186 - Redundant operation of an end terminal relative to at least two communication nodes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unify GmbH & Co. KG
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 6
80807 München / DE
[2016/41]
Former [2013/49]For all designated states
Unify GmbH & Co. KG
Hofmannstrasse 51
81379 München / DE
Former [2011/19]For all designated states
Siemens Enterprise Communications GmbH & Co. KG
Hofmannstrasse 51
81379 München / DE
Former [2004/51]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Berndt, Stefan
Am Darenberg 1
59199 Bönen / DE
02 / Bozionek, Bruno
Heinrichstrasse 2
33178 Borchen / DE
03 / Hanna, Thomas
Tulpenweg 8
32758 Detmold / DE
04 / Hinz, Bernd
Auf der Bitterhorst 51
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
05 / Laux, Thorsten
Holtackerweg 27
59558 Lippstadt / DE
06 / Neuhaus, Ralf
Fried-Wilh-Weber-Strasse 22m
44534 Lünen / DE
07 / Scheering, Christian Dr.
Erftweg 38
33689 Bielefeld / DE
08 / Uecker, Rainer
Vonscheidts Hof 21
45470 Mühlheim / DE
09 / Zimmermann, Rainer
Krügers Kamp 3
33106 Paderborn / DE
 [2004/51]
Representative(s)Fritzsche, Thomas , et al
Fritzsche Patent
Naupliastraße 110
81545 München / DE
[2017/11]
Former [2009/24]Fritzsche, Thomas , et al
Fritzsche Patent Naupliastrasse 110
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date03013173.411.06.2003
[2004/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1487186
Date:15.12.2004
Language:DE
[2004/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1487186
Date:15.03.2017
Language:DE
[2017/11]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1487186
Date:17.05.2017
[2017/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04M7/00, H04L29/06, H04L29/14
[2004/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/11]
Former [2004/51]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Kommunikationsanordnung zum wechselweisen Betrieb eines Endgerätes an zumindest zwei Kommunikationsknoten[2017/20]
English:Redundant operation of an end terminal relative to at least two communication nodes[2004/51]
French:Opération redondante d'un terminal de communication par rapport à au moins deux noeuds de communication[2004/51]
Former [2004/51]Redundanten Betrieb eines Endgerätes an zumindest zwei Kommunikationsknoten
Examination procedure01.04.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/51]
23.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2017Fee for grant paid
03.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
24.02.2017Request for correction of the decision to grant filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2011
Opposition(s)18.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
29.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
28.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
26.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
29.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.06.2003
CY15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
AT11.06.2017
IE11.06.2017
LU11.06.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU11.06.2003
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
AT11.06.2017
IE11.06.2017
LU11.06.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/50]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
AT11.06.2017
IE11.06.2017
LU11.06.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
IE11.06.2017
LU11.06.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/23]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
IE11.06.2017
LU11.06.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
LU11.06.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/09]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Former [2017/42]FI15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP1056254  (SIEMENS INF & COMM NETWORKS) [X] 1-7,10,12-14,16 * column 8 - column 12 * * figures 3,5 * [A] 8,9,11,15;
 [A]US6374302  (HOPE EDWARD M ET AL) [A] 1-16 * column 4 * * column 7 *;
 [A]US2003012178  (SPOREL ERIC RICHARD ET AL) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] *
Examination   - Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco IP TelephonyNetwork Design Guide, San Jose, Cisco Systems, Inc., (20000630), pages 3-1 - 3-22