Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1343317

EP1343317 - Client-server electronic program guide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.05.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Change - classificationpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rovi Guides, Inc.
2160 Gold Street
San Jose, CA 95002 / US
[2018/01]
Former [2017/16]For all designated states
Rovi Guides, Inc.
2 Circle Star Way
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
Former [2015/22]For all designated states
Rovi Guides, Inc.
2830 De La Cruz Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
Former [2011/26]For all designated states
United Video Properties, Inc.
2830 De La Cruz Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
Former [2003/37]For all designated states
United Video Properties, Inc.
7140 South Lewis Avenue
Tulsa, OK 74136 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ellis, Michael D.
1300 Kingwood Place
Boulder, CO 80304 / US
02 / Lemmons, Thomas R.
Route 2, Box 1178
Sand Springs, OK 74063 / US
03 / Thomas, William L.
11611 South 70th East Avenue
Bixby, OK 74008 / US
 [2003/37]
Representative(s)Pisani, Diana Jean
Haley Guiliano International LLP
Central Court
25 Southampton Buildings
London WC2A 1AL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/37]Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date03013369.820.08.1999
[2003/37]
Priority number, dateUS1999037404313.08.1999         Original published format: US 374043
US19980097538P21.08.1998         Original published format: US 97538 P
[2003/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1343317
Date:10.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1343317
Date:29.04.2009
[2009/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/16, H04N7/173
[2009/18]
Former International [2003/37]H04N7/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/37]
TitleGerman:Elektronischer Kundenserverprogrammführer[2003/37]
English:Client-server electronic program guide[2003/37]
French:Guide de programmes électronique client-serveur[2003/37]
Examination procedure22.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/49]
26.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
10.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
10.12.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination05.02.2015Appeal received No.  T1286/15
17.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99943801.3  / EP1099347
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990943801) is  16.09.2002
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 18
11.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 19
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 20
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Executiondeleted
[2014/34]
Former [2009/20]ID:01
For:AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE
Date:26.02.2009
[2014/34]
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9414284  (DISCOVERY COMMUNICAT INC [US]) [X] 1-17 * page 15, line 12 - page 18, line 12 * * page 59, line 11 - page 65, line 31 * * page 78, lines 16-24 * * figures 11-13 *;
 [X]DE4440419  (ISSING TILMAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10,13-15 * column 3, line 5 - column 5, line 24 * * column 6, lines 55-63 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9641478  (TV GUIDE ON SCREEN [US])
by applicantWO9414284
 DE444019