blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1386709

EP1386709 - Method and apparatus for picking up a plastic strand [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2007
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dieffenbacher GmbH + Co. KG
Heilbronner Strasse 20
75031 Eppingen / DE
[2006/11]
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
Dieffenbacher GmbH + Co. KG
Heilbronner Strasse 20
75031 Eppingen / DE
Former [2004/50]For all designated states
Dieffenbacher GmbH & Co. KG
Heilbronner Strasse
75031 Eppingen / DE
Former [2004/06]For all designated states
Maschinenfabrik J. Dieffenbacher GmbH & Co.
Heilbronnerstrasse 1
75031 Eppingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Brüssel, Richard
Hauptstrasse 106
75056 Sulzfeld / DE
 [2004/06]
Representative(s)Hartdegen, Anton
Angerfeldstrasse 12
82205 Gilching / DE
[2004/06]
Application number, filing date03013428.221.06.2003
[2004/06]
Priority number, dateDE200213329922.07.2002         Original published format: DE 10233299
[2004/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1386709
Date:04.02.2004
Language:DE
[2004/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1386709
Date:15.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2003
ClassificationIPC:B29C31/08
[2004/06]
CPC:
B29C43/34 (EP,US); B29C31/08 (EP,US); B29C2043/3411 (EP,US);
B29C2043/3416 (EP,US); B29C2043/3433 (EP,US); B29C31/042 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/06]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufnehmen eines Plastifikates[2004/06]
English:Method and apparatus for picking up a plastic strand[2004/06]
French:Procédé et appareil pour soulever un cordon de matière plastique[2004/06]
Examination procedure04.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/41]
26.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
06.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2006Fee for grant paid
09.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY15.03.2006
EE15.03.2006
FI15.03.2006
GB15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
NL15.03.2006
RO15.03.2006
SK15.03.2006
TR15.03.2006
BG15.06.2006
DK15.06.2006
SE15.06.2006
GR16.06.2006
LU21.06.2006
ES26.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
HU16.09.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]EE15.03.2006
FI15.03.2006
GB15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
NL15.03.2006
RO15.03.2006
SK15.03.2006
TR15.03.2006
BG15.06.2006
DK15.06.2006
SE15.06.2006
GR16.06.2006
LU21.06.2006
ES26.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
HU16.09.2006
Former [2008/32]EE15.03.2006
FI15.03.2006
GB15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
NL15.03.2006
RO15.03.2006
SK15.03.2006
BG15.06.2006
DK15.06.2006
SE15.06.2006
GR16.06.2006
ES26.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
HU16.09.2006
Former [2008/28]EE15.03.2006
FI15.03.2006
GB15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
NL15.03.2006
RO15.03.2006
SK15.03.2006
BG15.06.2006
DK15.06.2006
SE15.06.2006
GR16.06.2006
ES26.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
Former [2008/21]FI15.03.2006
GB15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
NL15.03.2006
RO15.03.2006
SK15.03.2006
BG15.06.2006
DK15.06.2006
SE15.06.2006
GR16.06.2006
ES26.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
Former [2007/45]FI15.03.2006
GB15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
NL15.03.2006
RO15.03.2006
SK15.03.2006
BG15.06.2006
DK15.06.2006
SE15.06.2006
ES26.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
Former [2007/42]FI15.03.2006
GB15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
IT15.03.2006
NL15.03.2006
RO15.03.2006
SK15.03.2006
BG15.06.2006
DK15.06.2006
SE15.06.2006
ES26.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
Former [2007/39]FI15.03.2006
GB15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
IT15.03.2006
NL15.03.2006
SK15.03.2006
BG15.06.2006
DK15.06.2006
SE15.06.2006
ES26.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
Former [2007/28]FI15.03.2006
GB15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
NL15.03.2006
SK15.03.2006
BG15.06.2006
DK15.06.2006
SE15.06.2006
ES26.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
Former [2007/13]FI15.03.2006
GB15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
NL15.03.2006
SK15.03.2006
BG15.06.2006
DK15.06.2006
SE15.06.2006
ES26.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
Former [2007/07]FI15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
NL15.03.2006
SK15.03.2006
BG15.06.2006
DK15.06.2006
SE15.06.2006
ES26.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
Former [2007/03]FI15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
NL15.03.2006
SK15.03.2006
BG15.06.2006
SE15.06.2006
ES26.06.2006
Former [2006/50]FI15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
NL15.03.2006
BG15.06.2006
SE15.06.2006
ES26.06.2006
Former [2006/48]FI15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
NL15.03.2006
BG15.06.2006
SE15.06.2006
Former [2006/45]FI15.03.2006
NL15.03.2006
SE15.06.2006
Former [2006/36]FI15.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPS60149410  ;
 [A]US4015872  (LOZNAK EDWARD J, et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *;
 [A]US4750605  (BREMS JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [XY]EP0396941  (KRUPP MASCHINENTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 2,5-9 * the whole document * [Y] 1,3;
 [A]EP0450482  (ROEDER & SPENGLER STANZ [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [XY]EP0588361  (IVECO FIAT [IT]) [X] 2-4 * the whole document * [Y] 1,3;
 [A]US6209709  (OUELLETTE JOSEPH F [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851210), vol. 009, no. 313, Database accession no. (M - 437), & JP60149410 A 19850806 (MATSUSHITA DENKO KK) [Y] 1,3 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.