blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1383045 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1383045



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 275
22.06.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
14.06.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 2
26.04.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
22.04.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 16
22.04.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
31.03.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
31.03.2016 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
01.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.12.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
14.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.12.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
11.12.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 9
08.12.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
29.10.2015 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
24.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.02.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
02.02.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 1
09.12.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
30.06.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
15.06.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
31.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
31.03.2011 Claims Appeal 3
31.03.2011 Claims Appeal 3
31.03.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
11.02.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
03.01.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.12.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
21.12.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 7
21.12.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 18
21.12.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
21.12.2010 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.12.2010 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
21.12.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
21.12.2010 Means of redress Search / examination 2
21.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.12.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.11.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
04.11.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
04.11.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
02.11.2010 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 2
02.11.2010 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 2
29.10.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
29.10.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 6
28.10.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.10.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.10.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
28.10.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
28.10.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
04.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
04.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
04.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
04.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
04.10.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
02.09.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
31.08.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
19.08.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
19.08.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.08.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
11.04.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.12.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
10.12.2007 Claims Search / examination 5
10.12.2007 Description Search / examination 4
10.12.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
24.10.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.10.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.05.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
29.05.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.10.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
09.05.2006 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
16.03.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.03.2006 European search report Search / examination 2
11.12.2003 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
23.06.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.06.2003 Claims Search / examination 4
23.06.2003 Description Search / examination 17
23.06.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.06.2003 Drawings Search / examination 7
23.06.2003 Priority document Search / examination 37
23.06.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6