blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1383045


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.06.2016 Refusal of application published on  20.07.2016  [2016/29]
20.04.2016 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
06.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.03.2016 Change: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.03.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.12.2015 Change: Date of oral proceedings
08.12.2015 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.02.2015 Change - applicant published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
12.06.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.06.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.04.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.06.2011 Change: Appeal number
17.06.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.04.2011 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
17.02.2011 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
17.02.2011 New entry: Appeal number
15.12.2010 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.12.2010 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
13.08.2010 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
16.06.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.01.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.10.2007 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.06.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.05.2007 First examination report
23.05.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.12.2006 Definitive list of designations published on  10.01.2007  [2007/02]
03.11.2006 Request for examination filed published on  06.12.2006  [2006/49]
23.06.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.03.2006 Publication of search report published on  03.05.2006  [2006/18]
03.03.2006 Change - classification published on  19.04.2006  [2006/16]
25.06.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.12.2003 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  21.01.2004  [2004/04]