blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1383045 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP03009718 EP03014099



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7661091Global Dossier 09.02.2010B2
US2005188354 25.08.2005A1
Priority number Date
US11884805 28.04.2005
US18698502 28.06.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7562095Global Dossier 14.07.2009B2
US2005165830 28.07.2005A1
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
US3696705 14.01.2005
US93929604 11.09.2004
US18698502 28.06.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7464107Global Dossier 09.12.2008B2
US2005114293 26.05.2005A1
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
US93929604 11.09.2004
US18698502 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100571466BGlobal Dossier 17.04.2006B1
KR20040002784 07.01.2004A
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5279979BGlobal Dossier 04.09.2013B2
JP2004038965 05.02.2004A
Priority number Date
US18698502 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP4365142BGlobal Dossier 18.11.2009B2
JP2004038958 05.02.2004A
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1378828Global Dossier 13.12.2006A3
EP1378828 07.01.2004A2
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1383045Global Dossier 03.05.2006A3
EP1383045 21.01.2004A2
Priority number Date
US18698502 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU2003204351B 12.11.2009B2
AU2003204351 22.01.2004A1
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR0302032 24.08.2004A
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2427288 16.08.2011C
CA2427288 28.12.2003A1
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1470984B 12.12.2012B
CN1470984 28.01.2004A
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CO5470295 30.12.2004A1
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1060925 06.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IL155571 03.11.2008A
IL155571D 23.11.2003D0
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MX342196 20.09.2016B
MXPA03005356 29.10.2004A
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MY133528 30.11.2007A
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NO331544B 23.01.2012B1
NO20032993L 29.12.2003L
NO20032993D 27.06.2003D0
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NZ525483 29.10.2004A
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PL360131 29.12.2003A1
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2321882 10.04.2008C2
RU2003119525 10.01.2005A
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG107142 29.11.2004A1
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI287203B 21.09.2007B
TW200408979 01.06.2004A
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6986123 10.01.2006B2
US2004003138 01.01.2004A1
Priority number Date
US18698502 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US7055132 30.05.2006B2
US2004002991 01.01.2004A1
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA200303345 22.04.2004B
Priority number Date
US18701202 28.06.2002