Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1383045

EP1383045 - Extensible on-demand property system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  17.06.2016
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 20.07.2016  [2016/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2004/04]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Finocchio, Mark J.
4631 168th Lt. NE
Redmond, Washington 98052 / US
 [2004/04]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/04]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03014099.023.06.2003
[2004/04]
Priority number, dateUS2002018698528.06.2002         Original published format: US 186985
[2004/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1383045
Date:21.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1383045
Date:03.05.2006
[2006/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/54
[2006/16]
Former International [2004/04]G06F9/44
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/04]
TitleGerman:Auf Anfrage expandierbares Eigentumsystem[2004/04]
English:Extensible on-demand property system[2004/04]
French:Système de proprietés extensible sur demande[2004/04]
Examination procedure25.10.2006Examination requested  [2006/49]
29.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2010Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/29]
21.12.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.03.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/29]
Appeal following examination11.02.2011Appeal received No.  T1370/11
31.03.2011Statement of grounds filed
11.03.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
11.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
31.03.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.05.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
07.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
06.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
05.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0036499  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-25 * abstract *
 [X]  - BALDWIN RICHARD G, "Javabeans, properties of beans, constrained properties", (19980219), pages 1 - 40, URL: http://www.dickbaldwin.com/java/Java512.htm, (20060214), XP002367776 [X] 1-15,18-25 * page 5, lines 1-3 *
 [XA]  - JORGENSEN B N ET AL, "Classifying component interaction in product-line architectures", TECHNOLOGY OF OBJECT-ORIENTED LANGUAGES AND SYSTEMS, 1999. TOOLS 32. PROCEEDINGS MELBOURNE, VIC., AUSTRALIA 22-25 NOV. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19991122), ISBN 0-7695-0462-0, pages 66 - 77, XP010364794 [X] 1-15,18-25 * page 67, paragraphs 2,2.1,2.2 - page 70 * [A] 16,17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TOOLS.1999.809415