Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1360970

EP1360970 - Method for using a safety shield assembly and related combinations thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.02.2006
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2010Change - representativepublished on 14.04.2010  [2010/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Becton Dickinson and Company
One Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/46]For all designated states
Becton, Dickinson and Company
1 Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Newby, Mark C.
186 Maplebrook
Tuxedo, New York 10987 / US
02 / Bennett, Michael C.
216 Mountain Avenue
Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US
03 / Crawford, Jamie
250 West 105th Street, Apt. 3-G
New York, New York 10025 / US
 [2003/46]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2003/46]Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date03014681.526.08.1999
[2003/46]
Priority number, dateUS19980098287P28.08.1998         Original published format: US 98287 P
[2003/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1360970
Date:12.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/32, A61M5/50
[2003/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/46]
TitleGerman:Methode zur Benutzung einer Schutzschild-Anordnung und daraus abgeleitete Kombination[2003/46]
English:Method for using a safety shield assembly and related combinations thereof[2003/46]
French:Méthode pour utiliser un assemblage de recouvrement protecteur et combinaison relatée de cela[2003/46]
Examination procedure27.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/46]
18.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/15]
07.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99116669.5  / EP0995456
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US5681295  (GYURE SANDOR [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 7, line 28 - line 36 * * figure 7 *;
 [A]EP0812597  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 2,3 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 4 * * figures 17,19 *;
 [A]US5632732  (SZABO SANDOR [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0702973  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 3,4 * column 10, line 44 - line 49 * * figures 1,7 *
by applicantUS5445619
 US5662617