Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1494394

EP1494394 - Distance-aware service mechanism for determining the availability of remote services in wireless personal area networks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.08.2009
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Deutschland GmbH
Kemperplatz 1
10785 Berlin / DE
[2006/05]
Former [2005/51]For all designated states
Sony Deutschland GmbH
Hugo-Eckener-Strasse 20
50829 Köln / DE
Former [2005/40]For all designated states
SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Kemperplatz 1
10785 Berlin / DE
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
Sony International (Europe) GmbH
Kemperplatz 1
10785 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Löbbert, Johannes, c/o Stuttgart Technology Center
Sony International GmbH, Hedelfinger Str. 61
70327 Stuttgart / DE
 [2005/01]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/01]Rupp, Christian, Dipl.Phys. , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date03014859.730.06.2003
[2005/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1494394
Date:05.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28
[2005/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/38]
Former [2005/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Abstandsbezogener Dienstmechanismus zur Bestimmung der Verfügbarkeit von Ferndiensten in drahtlosen Personal-Area-Netzen[2005/01]
English:Distance-aware service mechanism for determining the availability of remote services in wireless personal area networks[2005/01]
French:Mécanisme de découverte de services tenant en compte la distance pour déterminer la disponibilité de services distants dans un réseau "sans fil" personnel[2005/01]
Examination procedure06.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/27]
27.09.2005Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
03.11.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
01.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/40]
18.05.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.08.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005BG   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005CZ   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005EE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005HU   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005RO   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005SI   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005SK   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200907   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]WO0239484  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M) [X] 1,4,8,10,11 * abstract * * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 13 * * page 15, line 29 - page 16, line 14 * * page 28, line 17 - line 29; figure 43 * * page 34, line 4 - line 18 * [A] 3,5,6 [Y] 2;
 [X]EP1289200  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,7,9 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US2003036350  (LADLEY FERGAL ET AL) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0034] , [0036] , [0039] , [0040] , [0046] , [0047] *