Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1382980

EP1382980 - Active remote sensing using lock-in amplifiers and beam steering [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/04]active remote sensing using lock-in amplifiers and beam steering
[2009/45]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.12.2010
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ITT Manufacturing Enterprises, Inc.
1105 North Market Street Suite 1217
Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US
[2010/08]
Former [2004/04]For all designated states
ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC.
1105 North Market Street, Suite 1217
Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dobbs, Michael E.
10716 Maple Springs Cove
Fort Wayne, Indiana 46818 / US
02 / Roberts, Allan D.
112 Stratford Drive
Penrose, North Carolina 28766 / US
 [2004/04]
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/20]Dreiss
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2004/04]Esser, Wolfgang
ITT Industries Regional Patent Office - Europe c/o ITT Cannon GmbH Cannonstrasse 1
71384 Weinstadt / DE
Application number, filing date03015990.914.07.2003
[2004/04]
Priority number, dateUS2002019724718.07.2002         Original published format: US 197247
[2004/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1382980
Date:21.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1382980
Date:24.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:G01S17/87, G01S17/89, G01S17/32
[2004/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/04]
TitleGerman:Aktive Fernmessung mit Verwendung von Synchronisationsverstärkern und Strahlsteuerung[2004/04]
English:Active remote sensing using lock-in amplifiers and beam steering[2009/45]
French:Détection à distance employant amplificateurs à verrouillage et balayage de faisceaux[2004/04]
Former [2004/04]active remote sensing using lock-in amplifiers and beam steering
Examination procedure21.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/38]
28.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.03.2009
02.03.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.03.2009Date of oral proceedings
03.03.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2010Fee for grant paid
14.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.11.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.02.2010
BE24.02.2010
CY24.02.2010
CZ24.02.2010
DK24.02.2010
EE24.02.2010
FI24.02.2010
IT24.02.2010
NL24.02.2010
RO24.02.2010
SE24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
SK24.02.2010
TR24.02.2010
BG24.05.2010
GR25.05.2010
ES04.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
IE14.07.2010
LU14.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
HU25.08.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT24.02.2010
BE24.02.2010
CY24.02.2010
CZ24.02.2010
DK24.02.2010
EE24.02.2010
FI24.02.2010
IT24.02.2010
NL24.02.2010
RO24.02.2010
SE24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
SK24.02.2010
BG24.05.2010
GR25.05.2010
ES04.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
IE14.07.2010
LU14.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
HU25.08.2010
Former [2012/42]AT24.02.2010
BE24.02.2010
CY24.02.2010
CZ24.02.2010
DK24.02.2010
EE24.02.2010
FI24.02.2010
IT24.02.2010
NL24.02.2010
RO24.02.2010
SE24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
SK24.02.2010
BG24.05.2010
GR25.05.2010
ES04.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
IE14.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
HU25.08.2010
Former [2011/35]AT24.02.2010
BE24.02.2010
CY24.02.2010
CZ24.02.2010
DK24.02.2010
EE24.02.2010
FI24.02.2010
IT24.02.2010
NL24.02.2010
RO24.02.2010
SE24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
SK24.02.2010
BG24.05.2010
GR25.05.2010
ES04.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
IE14.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
Former [2011/20]AT24.02.2010
BE24.02.2010
CY24.02.2010
CZ24.02.2010
DK24.02.2010
EE24.02.2010
FI24.02.2010
IT24.02.2010
NL24.02.2010
RO24.02.2010
SE24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
SK24.02.2010
BG24.05.2010
GR25.05.2010
ES04.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
Former [2011/14]AT24.02.2010
BE24.02.2010
CY24.02.2010
CZ24.02.2010
DK24.02.2010
EE24.02.2010
FI24.02.2010
IT24.02.2010
NL24.02.2010
RO24.02.2010
SE24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
SK24.02.2010
BG24.05.2010
GR25.05.2010
ES04.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
MC31.07.2010
Former [2011/11]AT24.02.2010
BE24.02.2010
CY24.02.2010
CZ24.02.2010
DK24.02.2010
EE24.02.2010
FI24.02.2010
NL24.02.2010
RO24.02.2010
SE24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
SK24.02.2010
BG24.05.2010
GR25.05.2010
ES04.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
MC31.07.2010
Former [2011/07]AT24.02.2010
BE24.02.2010
CY24.02.2010
CZ24.02.2010
DK24.02.2010
EE24.02.2010
FI24.02.2010
NL24.02.2010
RO24.02.2010
SE24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
SK24.02.2010
BG24.05.2010
GR25.05.2010
ES04.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
Former [2010/51]AT24.02.2010
BE24.02.2010
CY24.02.2010
CZ24.02.2010
EE24.02.2010
FI24.02.2010
NL24.02.2010
RO24.02.2010
SE24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
SK24.02.2010
BG24.05.2010
GR25.05.2010
ES04.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
Former [2010/49]AT24.02.2010
BE24.02.2010
CY24.02.2010
CZ24.02.2010
EE24.02.2010
FI24.02.2010
NL24.02.2010
RO24.02.2010
SE24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
SK24.02.2010
GR25.05.2010
ES04.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
Former [2010/48]AT24.02.2010
BE24.02.2010
CY24.02.2010
EE24.02.2010
FI24.02.2010
NL24.02.2010
RO24.02.2010
SE24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
GR25.05.2010
ES04.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
Former [2010/46]AT24.02.2010
FI24.02.2010
NL24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
GR25.05.2010
ES04.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
Former [2010/45]AT24.02.2010
FI24.02.2010
NL24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
PT25.06.2010
Former [2010/38]AT24.02.2010
FI24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
PT25.06.2010
Former [2010/37]AT24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
PT25.06.2010
Former [2010/36]SI24.02.2010
PT25.06.2010
Former [2010/35]PT25.06.2010
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3489495  (BLAU DONALD Z, et al) [X] 14,15,19 * column A * * figures 8,10 * * claim 1 * [Y] 1-8,10-12;
 [XY]US4529317  (CRAMP JOHN H W [GB]) [X] 13-17,19-25 * column 5, lines 54-56; figures 1,2 * * column 6, lines 22-25 - lines 39-47 * [Y] 1-8,10-12;
 [Y]US6329661  (PEROV ALEXANDER [RU], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 3, lines 16-32 * * column 4, lines 18-22 *
by applicantUS3489495