blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1387562

EP1387562 - Portable device having exposure-adjustable image pick-up unit and exposure adjusting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  28.06.2013
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2013Refusal of applicationpublished on 31.07.2013  [2013/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/06]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamauchi, Kazunari
13-1, Hachihonmatsuiida 2-chome
Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP
 [2004/06]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Straße 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/06]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date03016076.615.07.2003
[2004/06]
Priority number, dateJP2002021504824.07.2002         Original published format: JP 2002215048
[2004/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1387562
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1387562
Date:28.09.2005
[2005/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.08.2005
ClassificationIPC:H04N1/028, G03B15/05, H04N5/235
[2005/04]
CPC:
H04N1/02815 (EP,US); H04N23/74 (EP,US); H04N1/0282 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2004/06]H04N1/028, G03B15/05
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/06]
TitleGerman:Tragbares Gerät mit belichtungsabhäniger Bildaufnahmevorrichtung und Gerät zur Einstellung der Belichtung[2004/06]
English:Portable device having exposure-adjustable image pick-up unit and exposure adjusting device[2004/06]
French:Appareil portable comprenant un dispositif de prise d'images à exposition ajustable et dispositif ajustable d'exposition[2004/06]
Examination procedure21.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/08]
07.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.03.2013
07.03.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
13.03.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/31]
23.03.2013Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/31]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.07.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
28.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH11205666  ;
 [X]JP2000156833  ;
 [X]JPS58147722  ;
 [Y]US5504584  (SOEDA HARUO [JP]) [Y] 19 * abstract *;
 [X]US5860029  (ICHIKAWA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,11-13,15-17 * claim 1 *;
 [X]GB2354832  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 19 * abstract *;
 [Y]US6272292  (IWASAKI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 4,14 * abstract *;
 [XY]US2001019364  (KAWAHARA HIDEO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11-13,15-17 * paragraphs [0009] , [0146] - [0178]; figures 11,13a,13b,15a,13b * [Y] 4,10,14,18;
 [Y]US2002067422  (MIURA TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0050] *;
 [PX]US2002197071  (HOFER GREGORY V [US]) [PX] 1,11 * figure 8 *;
 [PX]EP1318669  (SEIKO PRECISION KK [JP]) [PX] 1,2,11,12 * abstract *;
 [L]US6654062  (NUMATA HAJIME [JP], et al) [L] 10,18 * L : published in English *; column 4, lines 56-60 *;
 [L]US2004066461  (MAEDA YUTAKA [JP]) [L] 19-22 * abstract ** paragraphs [0006] , [0012] , [0013] , [0020] , [0021] , [0026] , [0040] - [0043] *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11205666 A 19990730 (CASIO COMPUT CO LTD) [Y] 10,18 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000156833 A 20000606 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 19-22 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831126), vol. 007, no. 266, Database accession no. (P - 239), & JP58147722 A 19830902 (CANON KK) [X] 19 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.