blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1387488

EP1387488 - Surface acoustic wave element manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/06]Surface acoustic wave element and its manufacturing method
[2006/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2007
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/08]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2004/06]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tomioka, Muneko
2-7-19-505, Yagumonakamachi
Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-0005 / JP
02 / Yamashita, Kiyoharu
2-13-8, Kamikamida
Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572-0052 / JP
03 / Furukawa, Mitsuhiro
9-11-4, Kasugadai Nishi-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2276 / JP
 [2004/06]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/06]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03017367.831.07.2003
[2004/06]
Priority number, dateJP2002022279231.07.2002         Original published format: JP 2002222792
[2004/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1387488
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1387488
Date:09.03.2005
[2005/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1387488
Date:21.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2005
ClassificationIPC:H03H3/08, H03H9/02, H03H9/145, H03H9/25
[2004/06]
CPC:
H03H9/02992 (EP,US); H03H3/08 (EP,US); H03H9/02921 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US); Y10T29/49005 (EP,US); Y10T29/49007 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49128 (EP,US); Y10T29/49144 (EP,US); Y10T29/49156 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49794 (EP,US); Y10T29/49798 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/48]
Former [2004/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Akustisches Oberflächenwellenelementherstellungsverfahren[2006/36]
English:Surface acoustic wave element manufacturing method[2006/36]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un élément à ondes acoustiques de surface[2006/36]
Former [2004/06]Akustisches Oberflächenwellenelement und Herstellungsverfahren
Former [2004/06]Surface acoustic wave element and its manufacturing method
Former [2004/06]Elément à ondes acoustiques de surface et son procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure25.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/25]
26.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2006Fee for grant paid
15.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2000013165  ;
 [A]EP0452105  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12* column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 32; figure 7 *;
 [A]US6034578  (FUJITA YUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 15 - column 6, line 3; figure 1 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 200, no. 004, & JP2000013165 A 20000114 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-12 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.