Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1389528 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1389528



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1781
24.03.2022 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
24.03.2022 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
24.03.2022 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
21.03.2022 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
16.12.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.12.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.12.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.12.2021 Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) Opposition 3
07.12.2021 Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) Opposition 3
07.12.2021 Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) Opposition 3
07.12.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 4
07.12.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 4
23.08.2021 Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit Opposition 2
09.04.2021 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
09.04.2021 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 4
09.04.2021 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 4
09.04.2021 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 4
06.04.2021 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 3
26.02.2021 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 3
26.11.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.11.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.11.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.11.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.11.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.11.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.11.2020 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
16.11.2020 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 30
16.11.2020 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 1
16.11.2020 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.11.2020 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.11.2020 Means of redress Opposition 2
14.10.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
14.10.2019 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
14.10.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.10.2019 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 22
23.05.2018 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
16.05.2018 Request concerning representative opponent Search / examination 2
23.04.2018 Request concerning representative opponent Search / examination 2
04.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.03.2017 Amended description with annotations Opposition 12
28.03.2017 Description Opposition 12
28.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
28.03.2017 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
07.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
07.02.2017 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
12.01.2017 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 2
29.11.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
29.11.2016 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
29.11.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.02.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 28
29.02.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.02.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.02.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.01.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Search / examination 2
04.01.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 9
09.12.2015 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
09.12.2015 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
09.12.2015 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
09.12.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
30.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
27.11.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.11.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.11.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
06.11.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
04.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.09.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 7
02.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.04.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
01.04.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
01.04.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
01.04.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 18
18.03.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.01.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
26.09.2014 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
09.09.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.09.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.09.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.09.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
03.09.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
12.08.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
07.07.2014 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
07.07.2014 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
07.07.2014 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
01.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.06.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 2
14.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.05.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
30.03.2012 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
01.07.2011 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
28.10.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.10.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
22.10.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
21.10.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
20.10.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
20.10.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
19.10.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
18.10.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 17
18.10.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.10.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 17
25.08.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Lawyer) Opposition 1
08.06.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 3
08.06.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.06.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
26.05.2010 Claims Appeal 4
26.05.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
21.05.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
21.05.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
12.05.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
31.03.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
29.03.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
23.03.2010 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
19.03.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
19.03.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.03.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 5
02.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.01.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.01.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.01.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.01.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.01.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
11.01.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
11.01.2010 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 29
11.01.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 20
11.01.2010 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.01.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.01.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.01.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
11.01.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
11.01.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.01.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 30
01.12.2009 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2009 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.11.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Lawyer) Opposition 1
03.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.10.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
30.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
30.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
30.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
27.10.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
27.10.2009 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
27.10.2009 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
27.10.2009 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
27.10.2009 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
27.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
27.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
27.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
09.10.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.10.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.10.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.09.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.09.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.09.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.09.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 13
09.09.2009 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
09.09.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.09.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2009 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 5
30.06.2009 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 4
30.06.2009 General authorisation Opposition 1
30.06.2009 General authorisation Opposition 1
30.06.2009 Request for change of name -opponent Opposition 2
26.06.2009 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 5
26.06.2009 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 4
26.06.2009 General authorisation Opposition 2
26.06.2009 Request for change of name -opponent Opposition 2
15.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.04.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 17
14.12.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.12.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.12.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.12.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 15
06.11.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
06.11.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
06.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.11.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 23
07.09.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.09.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.09.2007 Noting of loss of rights (opposition deemed not to have been filed) Opposition 1
20.08.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.07.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
30.07.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 25
30.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
30.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
30.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
30.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
30.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
30.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
30.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
30.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
30.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
30.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
26.07.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 10
26.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
26.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
26.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
26.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
26.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
26.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
26.07.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
26.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
26.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
26.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.07.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 10
25.07.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 10
25.07.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 25
25.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
25.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
25.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
25.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.07.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
28.09.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.09.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
11.09.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
11.09.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
19.05.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
19.05.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.05.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 60
24.04.2006 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.03.2005 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
25.02.2005 Claims Search / examination 7
25.02.2005 Claims Search / examination 6
25.02.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
25.02.2005 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
11.02.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
26.08.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.08.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.02.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
17.02.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.01.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
23.12.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 4
23.12.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.12.2003 European search report Search / examination 2
15.12.2003 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
29.10.2003 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
29.10.2003 Translation of priority document Search / examination 55
21.10.2003 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
14.10.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 50
06.10.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.08.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.08.2003 Claims Search / examination 7
11.08.2003 Description Search / examination 42
11.08.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.08.2003 Drawings Search / examination 12
11.08.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6