Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1391430

EP1391430 - Synergistic biocidal mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2016Revocation of patentpublished on 28.12.2016  [2016/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solenis Technologies Cayman, L.P.
Mühlentalstrasse 38
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
Solenis Technologies Cayman, L.P.
Rheinweg 11
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
Former [2007/39]For all designated states
HERCULES INCORPORATED
1313 N. Market Street, Hercules Plaza Wilmington
Delaware 19894-0001 / US
Former [2004/09]For all designated states
HERCULES INCORPORATED
1313 N. Market Street, Hercules Plaza
Wilmington, Delaware 19894-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mayer, Michael J.
2325 Edgewater Branch Drive
Jacksonville, Florida 32259 / US
02 / Cronan, John M. Jr.
4448 Ashmont Court
Jacksonville, Florida 32258 / US
 [2004/09]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/09]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date03017657.213.08.2003
[2004/09]
Priority number, dateUS20020405235P22.08.2002         Original published format: US 405235 P
US2002026650908.10.2002         Original published format: US 266509
[2004/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1391430
Date:25.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1391430
Date:26.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/50, C02F1/76, A01N59/00, A01N33/08, A01N33/06, A01N33/04, A01N33/12, A01N47/28, A01N47/44
[2007/15]
Former International [2004/09]C02F1/50, C02F1/76, A01N59/00, A01N33/08, A01N33/06, A01N33/04, A01N33/12, A01N47/28, A01N47/44, // (A01N59/00, 59:14, 59:02, 59:00, 37:02, 61:00, 47:10, 43:80, 43:78, 37:18, 35:02, 31:08, 29:02)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/09]
TitleGerman:Synergistische biozide Mischungen[2004/09]
English:Synergistic biocidal mixtures[2004/09]
French:Mélanges biocides synergétiques[2004/09]
Examination procedure07.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/24]
13.04.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.2007Fee for grant paid
19.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.06.2008  30.07.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Kemira Oyj
P.O. Box 44
02271 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Lang, Johannes, et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
 [2015/49]
Former [2010/28]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2008  30.07.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Kemira Oyj
P.O. Box 44
02271 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Kreller-Schober, Maria, et al
Patent -und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1
D-81679 München / DE
Former [2008/32]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2008   
Kemira Oyj
P.O. Box 44
02271 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Heikkinen, Esko Juhani, et al
Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
31.07.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.02.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.10.2010Date of oral proceedings
26.10.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.10.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
21.05.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/52]
Appeal following opposition04.01.2011Appeal received No.  T0038/11
03.03.2011Statement of grounds filed
21.05.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
21.05.2015Date of oral proceedings
28.05.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
03.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
TR26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
HU27.03.2008
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
[2016/50]
Former [2016/36]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
TR26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
HU27.03.2008
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2016/34]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
TR26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
HU27.03.2008
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2016/33]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
TR26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
HU27.03.2008
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2016/30]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
TR26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
HU27.03.2008
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2016/24]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
TR26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
HU27.03.2008
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2016/23]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
TR26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
HU27.03.2008
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2016/22]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
TR26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
HU27.03.2008
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2016/21]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
TR26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
HU27.03.2008
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2010/37]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
TR26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
HU27.03.2008
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2010/34]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
HU27.03.2008
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2010/32]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2009/38]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
BG26.12.2007
GR27.12.2007
IE13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2009/34]CY26.09.2007
CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
GR27.12.2007
IE13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2009/29]CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SI26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
GR27.12.2007
MC31.08.2008
Former [2009/22]CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
EE26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
GR27.12.2007
MC31.08.2008
Former [2009/18]CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
GR27.12.2007
MC31.08.2008
Former [2008/35]CZ26.09.2007
DK26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
GR27.12.2007
Former [2008/28]CZ26.09.2007
RO26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
GR27.12.2007
Former [2008/25]CZ26.09.2007
SK26.09.2007
GR27.12.2007
Former [2008/22]GR27.12.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0153216  (ALBEMARLE CORP) [X] 1-9,17,18,21-31 * page 8, paragraph 2 * * claims 1,4,5,7,9-13 *;
 [X]EP1001012  (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,17,21-25,31 * paragraphs [0010] , [0014] , [0024] , [0026] * * examples I-VII * * claims 1-3,6-11 *;
 [X]EP0185970  (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 1-7,9,17,21-25,31 * example 3 * * claims 1-3,6 *;
 [X]EP0252278  (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 1-7,9,17,21-25,31 * example 16 * * claims 1-7,10,11,14-23 *;
 [XY]WO9614092  (GRACE W R & CO) [X] 1-7,9,17,18,21-25,29,31 * page 4, line 33 - page 7, line 15 * * example 3 * * claims 11,12 * * examples 3,8,11,16,17,19,21 * * claims 1-10 * [Y] 10,11,13-16,19;
 [DXY]US5976386  (BARAK AYALA) [DX] 1-3,6,8,9,21-26,29-31 * examples 16,17 * * column 2, lines 50-67 * * examples 1,2,6-8,14 * [Y] 1-11,13-19,21-31;
 [Y]WO9639825  (BIO LAB INC) [Y] 1-11,13-19,21-31 * claims 1-9 *;
 [Y]EP1080641  (NALCO CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 1-11,13-19,21-31 * paragraphs [0001] , [0023] * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1,2,7-10,12-15 *;
 [Y]US3970755  (GAZZARD EDWARD GEORGE ET AL) [Y] 1-11,13-19,21-31 * claims 1-5 *;
 [Y]WO9841088  (BETZDEARBORN INC) [Y] 1-11,13-19,21-31 * page 2, paragraphs 2-4 * * claims 1-4,6-9 *;
 [Y]EP0913091  (NALCO CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 1-11,13-19,21-31 * examples 1-6 * * claims 1,2,6,8-10,15,16 *