Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1391430 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1391430



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 880
18.11.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
22.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Opposition 1
14.04.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Opposition 1
28.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
28.10.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
15.09.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
04.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.07.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 29
30.07.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.07.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
28.05.2015 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 2
28.05.2015 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 17
21.05.2015 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
24.04.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.04.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.04.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.04.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.04.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 32
21.04.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 2
11.12.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.12.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.12.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.12.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.12.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
04.12.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
01.12.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.11.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
17.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
17.11.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 116
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Appeal 2
11.11.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
30.01.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
29.07.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.07.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
14.03.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.03.2011 Claims Appeal 3
03.03.2011 Claims Appeal 3
03.03.2011 Claims Appeal 3
03.03.2011 Claims Appeal 3
03.03.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
15.02.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.01.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
10.01.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
04.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.01.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
30.10.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.10.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.10.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.10.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.10.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
26.10.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
26.10.2010 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
26.10.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
26.10.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
26.10.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
26.10.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
26.10.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
26.10.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
26.10.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.10.2010 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.08.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.08.2010 Claims Opposition 4
12.08.2010 Claims Opposition 4
12.08.2010 Claims Opposition 4
12.08.2010 Claims Opposition 4
12.08.2010 Claims Opposition 4
12.08.2010 Claims Opposition 4
12.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.08.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
12.08.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
10.08.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.08.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.06.2010 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
07.06.2010 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
01.06.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.06.2010 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
01.06.2010 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
15.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.03.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.03.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.02.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
26.02.2010 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.02.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.02.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.02.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
10.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.12.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
01.12.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.08.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
19.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
19.08.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
19.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
19.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
19.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
19.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
19.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
19.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
19.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
19.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
19.08.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
31.07.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
31.07.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2008 Request for documents Opposition 1
09.07.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.07.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 7
04.07.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
03.07.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.06.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
26.06.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
26.06.2008 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
30.08.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.07.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.07.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
19.07.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
05.04.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
05.04.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
05.04.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 33
30.01.2007 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.07.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
24.07.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
24.07.2006 Description Search / examination 2
24.07.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.03.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
24.03.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
21.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
21.02.2006 Description Search / examination 6
21.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
21.02.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.01.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.12.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.08.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
25.08.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.04.2004 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
07.04.2004 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
01.03.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
14.01.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
21.11.2003 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
21.11.2003 Priority document Search / examination 39
06.11.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 3
06.11.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.11.2003 European search report Search / examination 2
01.10.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.10.2003 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2003 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
30.09.2003 Priority document Search / examination 36
22.09.2003 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.08.2003 Claims Search / examination 4
13.08.2003 Description Search / examination 30
13.08.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6