Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1489524

EP1489524 - Storage area network with a cache server [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.09.2013
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.10.2013  [2013/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2012/23]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
Former [2004/52]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shimozono, Norio, Hitachi Ltd., Intel. Prop. Group
New Marunouchi Bldg.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
02 / Iwami, Naoko, Hitachi Ltd., Intellect. Prop. Group
New Marunouchi Bldg.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
03 / Honda, Kiyoshi, Hitachi, Ltd., Intell. Prop. Group
New Marunouchi Bldg.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
 [2012/46]
Former [2004/52]01 / Shimozono, Norio, Hitachi Ltd., Intel. Prop. Group
New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
02 / Iwami, Naoko, Hitachi Ltd., Intellect. Prop. Group
New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
03 / Honda, Kiyoshi, Hitachi, Ltd., Intell. Prop. Group
New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2012/46]
Former [2004/52]Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03018489.914.08.2003
[2004/52]
Priority number, dateJP2003017277018.06.2003         Original published format: JP 2003172770
[2004/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1489524
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1489524
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, H04L29/06
[2004/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/37]
Former [2004/52]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Speicherbereichsnetzwerk mit einem Cacheserver[2004/52]
English:Storage area network with a cache server[2004/52]
French:Réseau de zone de stockage avec un serveur cache[2004/52]
Examination procedure15.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/34]
21.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2012Fee for grant paid
01.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.10.2011
Opposition(s)15.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
21.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
13.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
24.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
23.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
28.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002124134  (CHILTON KENDELL [US]) [X] 1-12 * figures 5,8 * * page 1, paragraphs 3,4,8-10 * * page 2, paragraphs 22,26 * * page 3, paragraphs 32-34 *;
 [A]EP1085414  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,3 * * page 2, paragraph 9 * * page 3, paragraphs 9,17 * * page 4, paragraph 23 * * page 5, paragraph 36 * * page 7, paragraph 62 *;
 [A]WO03027856  (MARANTI NETWORKS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,2,10 * * page 5, paragraphs 13,14 * * page 7, paragraph 18 * * page 10, paragraph 27 * * page 11, paragraph 31 * * page 20, paragraph 59 * * page 28, paragraph 83 *;
 [A]WO03017598  (RHODE ISLAND EDUCATION [US]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,2,4 * * page 3, lines 1-13 * * page 5, lines 8-20 * * page 10, lines 9-19 * * page 11, lines 3-17 *