Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1365404

EP1365404 - Method and apparatus of recording data in the optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 21.07.2004  [2004/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
20, Yoido-Dong
Youngdungpo-Gu
Seoul 150-010 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2003/48]For all designated states
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
20, Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-ku
Seoul 150-010 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Myong Gu, Hyondae Apt., 601-104
Kummaeul Pyongchon-dong Tongan-gu
Anyang-shi Kyonggi-do 431-070 / KR
02 / Park, Yong Cheol
Jukong Apt., 215-204 Wonmun-dong
Kwachon-shi Kyonggi-do 427-030 / KR
03 / Jeong, Kyu Hwa
Sinwondang Apt., 701-1101 Songsa-dong Tokyang-gu
Koyang-shi Kyonggi-do 412-020 / KR
04 / Shin, Jong In
830-26, Anyang-dong Manan-gu
Anyang-shi Kyonggi-do 430-010 / KR
 [2003/48]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/48]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date03018732.215.07.1999
[2003/48]
Priority number, dateKR1998003032028.07.1998         Original published format: KR 9830320
KR1998003140601.08.1998         Original published format: KR 9831406
KR1998003979724.09.1998         Original published format: KR 9839797
[2003/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1365404
Date:26.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/48]
ClassificationInternational:G11B20/18
[2003/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/48]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Datenaufzeichnung auf ein optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium[2003/48]
English:Method and apparatus of recording data in the optical recording medium[2003/48]
French:Méthode et appareil d'enregistrement de données sur un support d'enregistrement optique[2003/48]
Examination procedure25.05.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/30]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99929938.1  / EP1018116
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05