Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7711982 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2010 | B2 | US2007294571 | 20.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43152103 | 08.05.2003 | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | US35964699 | 26.07.1999 | US60178106 | 20.11.2006 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | US88988907 | 17.08.2007 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7603584 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2009 | B2 | US2007294569 | 20.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43152103 | 08.05.2003 | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | US35964699 | 26.07.1999 | US60178106 | 20.11.2006 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | US88995907 | 17.08.2007 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7441149 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2008 | B2 | US2007079173 | 05.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43152003 | 08.05.2003 | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | US35964699 | 26.07.1999 | US60787106 | 04.12.2006 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7380159 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2008 | B2 | US2007067672 | 22.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43152103 | 08.05.2003 | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | US35964699 | 26.07.1999 | US60178406 | 20.11.2006 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7380162 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2008 | B2 | US2007067671 | 22.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43152103 | 08.05.2003 | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | US35964699 | 26.07.1999 | US60178106 | 20.11.2006 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7380178 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2008 | B2 | US2005022053 | 27.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | US87812104 | 29.06.2004 | US35964699 | 26.07.1999 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7139935 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2006 | B2 | US2003196133 | 16.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43152103 | 08.05.2003 | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | US35964699 | 26.07.1999 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7146527 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2006 | B2 | US2003191981 | 09.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43152003 | 08.05.2003 | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | US35964699 | 26.07.1999 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100463554B | Global Dossier | 30.12.2004 | B1 | KR20040075799 | 30.08.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100459148B | Global Dossier | 03.12.2004 | B1 | KR20040038943 | 08.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100407980B | Global Dossier | 01.12.2003 | B1 | KR20030067650 | 14.08.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002521786 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR9900374 | 15.07.1999 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1465189 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2012 | B1 | EP1465189 | 03.08.2005 | A3 | EP1465189 | 06.10.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP99929938 | 15.07.1999 | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1455358 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2013 | B1 | EP1455358 | 06.05.2009 | A3 | EP1455358 | 08.09.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP99929938 | 15.07.1999 | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1450364 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2012 | B1 | EP1450364 | 17.08.2005 | A3 | EP1450364 | 25.08.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP99929938 | 15.07.1999 | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1447807 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2013 | B1 | EP1447807 | 03.06.2009 | A3 | EP1447807 | 18.08.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP99929938 | 15.07.1999 | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1365405 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP99929938 | 15.07.1999 | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1018116 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2005 | B1 | EP1018116 | 12.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR9900374 | 15.07.1999 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4657099 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR9900374 | 15.07.1999 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1365404 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP99929938 | 15.07.1999 | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE305166T | 15.10.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR9900374 | 15.07.1999 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI9906653 | 25.08.2015 | B1 | BR9906653 | 29.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR9900374 | 15.07.1999 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69927345T | 13.07.2006 | T2 | DE69927345D1 | 02.02.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR9900374 | 15.07.1999 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100421844B | 17.04.2004 | B1 | KR20000020951 | 15.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100447157B | 14.10.2004 | B1 | KR20000010462 | 15.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0007185 | Global Dossier | 10.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4762276B | Global Dossier | 31.08.2011 | B2 | JP2008287875 | 27.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4688907B | Global Dossier | 25.05.2011 | B2 | JP2008287874 | 27.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4314269B | Global Dossier | 12.08.2009 | B2 | JP2007109394 | 26.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4314268B | Global Dossier | 12.08.2009 | B2 | JP2007095308 | 12.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4113234B | Global Dossier | 09.07.2008 | B2 | JP2007095307 | 12.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4773847B | Global Dossier | 14.09.2011 | B2 | JP2006196172 | 27.07.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4020889B | Global Dossier | 12.12.2007 | B2 | JP2004234859 | 19.08.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3995628B | Global Dossier | 24.10.2007 | B2 | JP2004030880 | 29.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3927143B | Global Dossier | 06.06.2007 | B2 | JP2004030879 | 29.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100338675C | 19.09.2007 | C | CN1532836 | 29.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100405495C | 23.07.2008 | C | CN1529316 | 15.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100481233C | 22.04.2009 | C | CN1532835 | 29.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100481242C | 22.04.2009 | C | CN1547203 | 17.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1168089C | 22.09.2004 | C | CN1274462 | 22.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1066317 | 18.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1066628 | 24.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1066629 | 24.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1068450 | 29.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6782488 | 24.08.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR19980039797 | 24.09.1998 | KR19980031406 | 01.08.1998 | KR19980030320 | 28.07.1998 | Type | Earlier application | EP1018116 |