Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1393914

EP1393914 - Controlling recovery by monitoring the cap-open state [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2006
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 07.11.2007  [2007/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/10]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2 Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Seki, Satoshi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Otsuka, Naoji
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Iwasaki, Osamu
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Teshigawara, Minoru
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Nakagawa, Yoshinori
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2004/10]
Representative(s)Weser, Wolfgang
Weser & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/10]Weser, Wolfgang, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Application number, filing date03018868.419.08.2003
[2004/10]
Priority number, dateJP2002025389330.08.2002         Original published format: JP 2002253893
[2004/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1393914
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1393914
Date:31.03.2004
[2004/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1393914
Date:23.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/165
[2004/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/52]
Former [2004/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Steuerung der Wartung durch Beobachtung des offenen Zustands einer Kappe[2004/10]
English:Controlling recovery by monitoring the cap-open state[2004/10]
French:Commande d'entretien par surveiller la position ouverte du bouchon[2004/10]
Examination procedure30.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/49]
07.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2005Fee for grant paid
19.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/39]IT23.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]US6019451  (TERASAWA KOJI ET AL) [A] 1,13 * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 18; figure 1 * * column 8, line 11 - line 27; figure 8 *;
 [A]US5086305  (TERASAWA KOJI) [A] 1,13 * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 50; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]JPS63252748
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890202), vol. 013, no. 045, Database accession no. (M - 792), & JP63252748 A 19881019 (CANON INC) [A] 1,13 * abstract *