blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1431545

EP1431545 - Control valve assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.10.2009
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.11.2009  [2009/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pierburg GmbH
Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1
41460 Neuss / DE
[2004/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Hüsges, Hans-Jürgen
Hörenweg 18
47877 Willich / DE
 [2004/26]
Representative(s)terpatent Patentanwälte und European Patent Attorneys ter Smitten Eberlein -Van Hoof
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Burgunderstraße 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/12]Patentanwälte ter Smitten
Burgunder Strasse 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2004/26]Ter Smitten, Hans
Pierburg GmbH, Patentabteilung, Alfred-Pierburg Strasse 1
41460 Neuss / DE
Application number, filing date03019234.826.08.2003
[2004/26]
Priority number, dateDE2002105889517.12.2002         Original published format: DE 10258895
[2004/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1431545
Date:23.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1431545
Date:23.05.2007
[2007/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1431545
Date:26.11.2008
Language:DE
[2008/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.2007
ClassificationIPC:F02D9/10
[2004/26]
CPC:
F02D9/1045 (EP); F02D9/1015 (EP); F16K1/222 (EP);
F16K1/223 (EP); F16K1/226 (EP); F02B27/0215 (EP);
F02B27/0273 (EP); F02D9/107 (EP); F02D9/108 (EP);
F02D9/1095 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2008/05]
Former [2004/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schaltklappenvorrichtung[2004/26]
English:Control valve assembly[2004/26]
French:Ensemble volets de commande[2004/26]
Examination procedure26.08.2003Examination requested  [2004/26]
17.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2008Fee for grant paid
17.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.08.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB232243  (SIEMENS SCHUCKERTWERKE GMBH) [A] 1* the whole document *;
 [X]DE1775012  (DU PONT) [X] 1-3,7,8 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1028238  (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.