blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1376578

EP1376578 - Magnetic tape cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.09.2006  [2006/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP
Former [2004/01]For all designated states
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
210 Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shiga, Hideaki
Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd., 12-1 Oogi-cho 2-chome
Odawara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 250-0001 / JP
02 / Ishihara, Yusuke
Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd., 12-1 Oogi-cho 2-chome
Odawara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 250-0001 / JP
03 / Morita, Kiyoo
Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd., 12-1 Oogi-cho 2-chome
Odawara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 250-0001 / JP
04 / Takahashi, Daisuke
Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd., 12-1 Oogi-cho 2-chome
Odawara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 250-0001 / JP
05 / Tsuyuki, Seiji
Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd., 12-1 Oogi-cho 2-chome
Odawara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 250-0001 / JP
 [2004/01]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/01]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03019406.218.06.1999
[2004/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998022773712.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22773798
JP1998023837525.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23837598
[2004/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1376578
Date:02.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1376578
Date:03.03.2004
[2004/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1376578
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.2004
ClassificationIPC:G11B23/107, G11B23/027, G11B23/037, G11B23/26
[2004/03]
CPC:
G11B23/26 (EP,US); G11B23/08 (KR); G11B23/027 (EP,US);
G11B23/107 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2004/01]G11B23/107
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2004/01]
TitleGerman:Magnetbandkassette[2004/01]
English:Magnetic tape cartridge[2004/01]
French:Cassette à bande magnétique[2004/01]
Examination procedure02.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/23]
30.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2005Fee for grant paid
27.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99925370.1  / EP1158521
Opposition(s)29.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4452406  (RICHARD MAURICE E [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 28 - column 5, line 65; figures 1-5 * [A] 2-6;
 [XA]US4717090  (SMITH DAVID E [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 15 - column 1, line 56; figures 1-3 * [A] 2-6;
 [XA]EP0398671  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 45 - column 7, line 12; examples 4-9 * [A] 2-6;
 [A]DE9217315U  (MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING CO.) [A] * page 5, line 20 - page 7, line 20; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5465187  (HOGE DAVID T [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.