Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1394006

EP1394006 - Vehicle electronic key system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2007
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 26.11.2008  [2008/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO
260, Toyota 3-chome
Ohguchi-cho
Niwa-gun
Aichi 480-0195 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/25]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO
260, Toyota 3-chome, Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun
Aichi 480-0195 / JP
Former [2004/10]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho
260, Toyota 3-chome, Ohguchi-cho
Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Suyama, Terumasa
K.K. Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho, 3-260, Toyota
Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP
02 / Ichikawa, Takashi
K.K. Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho, 3-260, Toyota
Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP
 [2004/10]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/48]Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 440151
80750 München / DE
Former [2004/10]Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner GbR
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Application number, filing date03019517.628.08.2003
[2004/10]
Priority number, dateJP2002025180629.08.2002         Original published format: JP 2002251806
[2004/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1394006
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1394006
Date:21.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:B60R25/04, G07C9/00
[2004/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/48]
Former [2004/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Elektronisches Fahrzeugschlüsselsystem[2004/10]
English:Vehicle electronic key system[2004/10]
French:Sytème de clé électronique pour voitures[2004/10]
Examination procedure06.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/24]
08.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2006Fee for grant paid
27.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19842544  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1-3,7,12-15 * column 1, line 16 - line 59 * * column 3, line 25 - line 38 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 43 * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 64 * * column 6, line 44 - line 58 *;
 [X]DE10103044  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1,8-11 * column 4, line 21 - line 49 * * column 2, line 56 - line 68; figure - *;
 [X]US5525977  (SUMAN MICHAEL J) [X] 1,4,7,12-14 * column 2, line 54 - line 65 * * column 5, line 19 - line 42 *;
 [X]US6198996  (BERSTIS VIKTORS) [X] 1-4,7,12,13,15 * column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 5 * * column 10, line 8 - line 13 * * column 13, line 8 - line 25 * * column 14, line 41 - line 48 * * column 15, line 1 - line 33 * * column 17, line 4 - line 30 * * column 18, line 10 - line 14 * * column 19, line 3 - line 46 *;
 [X]WO0222407  (BORGEOIS LEE ALAN ; HALLACQ CARLO (AU); OZ WORX PTY LTD (AU)) [X] 1-4,7,12-15 * page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 20 * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 1 * * page 9, line 31 - page 10, line 15 *;
 [A]EP1216900  (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC) [A] 1,8-11 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 31; figure 3 * * column 5, line 26 - line 36 * * column 6, line 3 - line 22 * * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 16 *