blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1396643

EP1396643 - Connecting device for connecting structural elements to pipes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.2006
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.08.2006  [2006/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hartmann, Rainer, Dr.-Ing.
Ringstrasse 13D
42499 Hückeswagen / DE
[2004/11]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2004/13]
Representative(s)Füssel, Michael
Dr. Sturies, Eichler & Füssel Patentanwaltskanzlei Lönsstrasse 55
42289 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/11]Füssel, Michael
Dr. Sturies - Eichler - Füssel Patentanwälte Lönsstrasse 55
42289 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date03020284.008.09.2003
[2004/11]
Priority number, dateDE2002213764U06.09.2002         Original published format: DE 20213764 U
DE2003201226U27.01.2003         Original published format: DE 20301226 U
DE2003204606U22.03.2003         Original published format: DE 20304606 U
[2004/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1396643
Date:10.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2003
ClassificationIPC:F16B2/06, F16B5/06
[2004/11]
CPC:
F16B2/065 (EP); E04F11/1851 (EP); F16B35/06 (EP);
F16B37/00 (EP); F16B5/0685 (EP); F16B23/0038 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/11]
TitleGerman:Verbindungselement zum Anschluss von Bauteilen an Rohre[2004/11]
English:Connecting device for connecting structural elements to pipes[2004/11]
French:Dispositif pour l'ancrage d'éléments de construction avec des tuyaux[2004/11]
Examination procedure16.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/12]
12.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/32]
27.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2820656  (CHRISTIAN JENSEN OTTO) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 55; figures 1-4 * [A] 3-21;
 [XA]GB1301534  (COAL INDUSTRY (PATENTS) LTD) [X] 1,2,7,8 * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 16; figures 1-6 * [A] 3-6,9-21;
 [A]US5099760  (SCHNEIDER HORST [DE]) [A] 11-21 * abstract *;
 [AD]DE20000903U  (ROSE & KRIEGER GMBH CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-21* abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.